Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:August B Landis
Case #: 2:18-bk-12139
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Jan 14, 2020

Debtor
VISION AIRLINES, INC.
2705 AIRPORT DR.
N. LAS VEGAS, NV 89032
Represented By
VISION AIRLINES, INC.
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
FLAGSHIP EXPRESS AIRLINES, INC.
P.O. BOX 1124
WHEATON, IL 60187
Represented By
GEORGE A. THOMAS
contact info
AARON R. DEAN
The Dean Legal Group, Ltd
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
ULTRA AVIATION SERVICES
P.O. BOX 668080
MIAMI, FL 33166
Represented By
GEORGE A. THOMAS
contact info
AARON R. DEAN
The Dean Legal Group, Ltd
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
GLOBAL PARTS SUPPORT, INC.
2550 NW COURT
FORT LAUDERDALE, FL 33311
Represented By
GEORGE A. THOMAS
contact info
AARON R. DEAN
The Dean Legal Group, Ltd
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
AIRGAS USA, LLC
721 S 6TH ST
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
AARON R. DEAN
The Dean Legal Group, Ltd
contact info
Trustee
BRIAN D. SHAPIRO
510 S. 8TH STREET
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
ROBERT E. ATKINSON
Atkinson Law Associates Ltd
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 7
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD, SO. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 11/19/2020 1:30 PM PST
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
1 1 misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/18 2:03 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335. Re: Vision Airlines, Inc. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Flagship Express Airlines, Inc., Ultra Aviation Services, GLOBAL PARTS SUPPORT, INC..(DEAN, AARON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Flagship Corporate Resolution
Att: 2 Exhibit Ultra Corporate Resolution
Att: 3 Exhibit Global Parts Corporate Resolution
Att: 4 Exhibit Vision Airlines Judgment List
Att: 5 Exhibit Vision Airlines Case History List
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Wed 04/18 2:38 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 18-12139 [misc,invol7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 18146965, fee amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1