Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:18-cv-00703
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2018
Terminated:Apr 22, 2021
Last checked: Monday Oct 15, 2018 2:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Harbor Green Las Vegas, LLC
5375 E. Cheyenne Avenue
Las Vegas, NV 89156
Defendant
Sam Shang
30043 Avenida Classica
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275
Plaintiff
Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC
2950 West 900 South
Salt Lake City, UT 89104
Represented By
Phillip Mark Rinehart
The Law Offices Of Phillip M. Rinehart
contact info
Angelo L Rosa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 22, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/22 8:10 AM
Civil Case Terminated per19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. (SLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
19 19 motion Motion Dismiss Wed 03/17 9:00 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice, by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip) Modified event on 3/17/2021 (SLD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
18 18 misc Notice 41-1 Dismissal Tue 03/02 12:33 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 4/1/2021. (EDS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
17 17 misc Declaration Wed 06/03 9:44 PM
DECLARATION of Angelo L. Rosa re16 Notice re 41-1 Dismissal by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
16 16 misc Notice 41-1 Dismissal Mon 05/04 10:32 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 6/3/2020. (EDS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
15 15 notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Wed 08/07 2:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-00703-GMN-DJA . (no image attached) (MR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 11/19 8:52 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Harbor Green Las Vegas, LLC, Sam Shang re13 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (ADR)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 18, 2018
13 13 motion Motion Entry of Clerks Default Sun 11/18 8:34 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Phillip M. Rinehart in Support,
Att: 2 Supplement Default
Thursday, November 08, 2018
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Thu 11/08 7:28 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion for Writ of Attachment; ORDER denying11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
11 11 motion Motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 11/07 10:05 AM
EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; filed by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Declaration of Angelo R. Rosa,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
10 10 motion Motion Writ of Attachment Tue 11/06 9:42 PM
First MOTION for Writ of Attachment by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Angelo R. Rosa,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, August 03, 2018
9 9 misc Affidavit Fri 08/03 1:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice 4m Dismissal Fri 08/03 11:41 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint * in this action was filed on * 4/18/2018. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * All Defendants. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 8/31/2018. (RFJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
7 7 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/13 2:21 PM
ORDER granting5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Angelo Rosa and approving Designation of Local Counsel Phillip Mark Rinehart. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/13/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Motion Fri 05/25 11:01 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that4 plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC's ex parte motion for alternative service is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/24/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
5 5 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 05/18 3:54 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Angelo L. Rosa and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Phillip M. Rinehart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5092585) by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. (Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
3 3 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Thu 04/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Angelo L Rosa to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 6/3/2018. (no image attached) (ADR)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/19 9:26 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants re1 Complaint. (ADR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/18 5:27 PM
First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5055206) by Rocky Mountain Recycling, LLC. Proof of service due by 7/17/2018.(Rinehart, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 04/19 9:23 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR)
Related: [-]