Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:12-ag-72828
Typeagency / review / tacoma western washington
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2012
Terminated:Oct 16, 2013
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 6:08 PM PST
Petitioner
SANDRO MARTIN ENCISO-PARODI
Represented By
Sandro Martin Enciso-Parodi
FDC - FEDERAL DETENTION CENTER - OAKDALE
contact info
Respondent
ERIC H. HOLDER, Jr., Attorney General
Represented By
Anthony Paul Nicastro
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Chief Counsel ICE
OFFICE OF THE CHIEF COUNSEL
contact info
Oil
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Sheri Robyn Glaser
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2025 6:01 PM PST
Tuesday, September 04, 2012
1 1 FILED PROSE BIA PETITION FOR REVIEW AND MOTION FOR STAY. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4 (c)(1)(3) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Certified Administrative Record due 10/30/2012. Response to motion for stay due 11/27/2012 for Eric H. Holder Jr., Attorney General. (Motion for ifp is attached to petition) [8309224] (GR) [Entered: 09/04/2012 02:36 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs form(s) sent
Att: 2 1 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 3 8 pgs Petition for review with stay motion/Motion for IFP
2 2 Filed Petitioner Sandro Martin Enciso-Parodi motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Served on 08/30/2012. [8309238] (GR) [Entered: 09/04/2012 02:39 PM]
Related: [-]