Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01455
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2018
Terminated:May 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Balwara LLC
Represented By
Balwara LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 05/12 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1455 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
25 25 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #24 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
24 24 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
23 23 3 pgs misc Stipulation Mon 05/06 11:10 AM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Against Balwara LLC Related [+] Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, February 01, 2019
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/01 9:37 AM
Certificate of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 Filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Balwara LLC. (Magaliff, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/31 5:08 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures. Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
20 20 6 pgs answer Answer, Amended Complaint Tue 01/29 12:20 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Balwara LLC. (Magaliff, Howard)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/23 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service regarding service of 1st Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 15
Sunday, January 20, 2019
18 18 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 01/21 12:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 01/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Friday, January 18, 2019
17 17 order Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC) Fri 01/18 3:55 PM
Scheduling Order Signed On 1/18/2019. Re: Final Pretrial Conference with hearing to be held on 8/15/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Motion. Authorize Fri 01/18 3:52 PM
Order Signed On 1/18/2019 Re: Granting Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
15 15 71 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/15 2:12 PM
Amended Complaint against Balwara LLC (First) to: (I) Avoid Obligations Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 548; (II) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (III) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 11 ,1
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
14 14 answer Objection Tue 01/08 2:34 PM
Objection to Motion Related [+] filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Balwara LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Magaliff, Howard)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 12/11 7:56 PM
Affidavit of Service of Keenan K. Baldeo Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Against Balwara LLC Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, December 10, 2018
12 12 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 12/10 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
11 11 motion Motion, Authorize Wed 12/05 11:15 AM
Motion to Authorize (Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) Related [+] filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 1/8/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Blackline of First Amendment Complaint Against Current Complaint
Wednesday, November 21, 2018
10 10 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 11/21 12:32 PM
Notice of Hearing (Notice of Pretrial Scheduling Conference) Related [+] filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with hearing to be held on 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, November 09, 2018
9 9 1 pgs misc Mediator's Final Report Not Settled Fri 11/09 10:08 AM
Mediator's Final Report Not Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A. Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
8 8 misc Affidavit Fri 08/10 2:51 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
7 7 4 pgs answer None Tue 08/07 10:22 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Balwara LLC. (Magaliff, Howard)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 02, 2018
6 6 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/02 10:25 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Balwara LLC. (Magaliff, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 3:59 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,1
Thursday, June 28, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/28 2:26 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Balwara LLC . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 06/26 6:30 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 5:22 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Thursday, April 19, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 04/19 11:58 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/19 11:51 AM
Adversary case 18-01455 Complaint against Balwara LLC to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 04/19 4:11 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01455 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12538225. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1