Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01458
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2018
Terminated:May 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hebt Irvine 1 LLC
Represented By
Hebt Irvine 1 LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 05/12 10:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1458 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
23 23 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
22 22 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
21 21 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 12/03 5:59 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
20 20 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 10/30 2:58 PM
So Ordered Third Stipulation And Order Signed On 10/30/2019. Re: To Extend Time For The Defendant To Respond To The Complaint (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
19 19 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 10/02 9:35 AM
So Ordered Second Stipulation And Order Signed On 10/2/2019. Re: Extending TimeFor The Defendant To Respond To The Complaint (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
18 18 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 08/30 8:16 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 8/29/2019. Re: First Stipulation And Order To Extend Time For The Defendant To Respond To The Complaint (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
17 17 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 08/05 7:59 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 8/2/2019. Re: Set Aside Entry Of Default Against Hebt Irvine 2 LLC Related [+] (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 12
16 16 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 08/05 7:56 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 8/2/2019. Re: To Set Aside Entry Of Default Against Hebt Irvine 1 LLC Related [+] (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/11 4:31 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding Entry of Default Judgement Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 12
Sunday, June 02, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Sun 06/02 10:05 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, June 01, 2019
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sun 06/02 12:25 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Thursday, May 30, 2019
12 12 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/30 12:50 PM
Clerk's Entry Of Default Against HEBT Irvine 1 LLC Related [+]. (Mercado, Tracey)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
11 11 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/29 1:53 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 2nd Summons, 3rd Summons, 1st Amended Complaint, COS and Suppl. COS
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
Friday, April 12, 2019
10 10 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 4:24 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
9 9 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 1:39 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/14 3:25 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Third Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3 ,7
7 7 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 08/14 1:07 PM
Third Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Hebt Irvine 1 LLC . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 08/14 10:24 AM
Request for a Third Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/14 8:07 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3 ,4
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
5 5 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 9:44 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 06/12 2:47 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Hebt Irvine 1 LLC . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/11 9:57 AM
Amended Complaint against Hebt Irvine 1 LLC (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 06/11 3:34 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 04/19 12:25 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/19 11:58 AM
Adversary case 18-01458 Complaint against Hebt Irvine 1 LLC to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 04/19 4:11 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01458 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12538225. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1