Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01460
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2018
Terminated:May 05, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jiangsu 1 Touch
Represented By
Jiangsu 1 Touch
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/05 4:26 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1460 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
10 10 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 05/04 2:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, April 17, 2020
9 9 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/17 10:34 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Fifth Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/5/2020,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, October 14, 2019
8 8 motion Motion, Extend Time Mon 10/14 2:56 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Fourth Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/31/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 4:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 1:53 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Mon 07/02 4:51 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Jiangsu 1 Touch. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/29 7:00 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/18 12:57 PM
Amended Complaint against Jiangsu 1 Touch (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 10:58 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Thursday, April 19, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 04/19 12:28 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/19 12:01 PM
Adversary case 18-01460 Complaint against Jiangsu 1 Touch to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 04/19 4:11 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01460 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12538225. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1