MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. GEORGE GRUNDY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Curtis Joyner |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01635 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 15, 2018 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
GEORGE GRUNDY
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Terminated: 09/24/2018
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Default
Thu 02/28 2:43 PM
ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT GEORGE GRUNDY IS GRANTED & THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT IN THIS MATTER IN FAVOR OF PLFF & AGAINST DEFT IN THE AMOUNT OF $21,000.00. PLFF'S REQUEST FOR AN INJUNCTION IS GRANTED & DEFT IS PERMANENTLY ENJOINED FROM DIRECTLY CONTRIBUTORILY OR INDIRECTLY INFRINGING PLFF'S RIGHTS UNDER FEDERAL OR STATE LAW OF PLFF'S COPYRIGHTED WORKS, ETC. PLFF'S REQUEST FOR RECOVERY OF ITS COSTS, TOTALING $634.73 IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/27/19. 2/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Thu 02/14 10:53 AM
Memorandum re10 First MOTION for Default Judgment against George Grundy filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 02/14 10:52 AM
First MOTION for Default Judgment against George Grundy filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.Memorandum.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Request for Default
Mon 02/04 11:15 AM
Request for Default MALIBU MEDIA, LLC against GEORGE GRUNDY.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 02/05 2:36 PM
DEFAULT BY GEORGE GRUNDY FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (kw, ) |
||
misc
Default Entered
Tue 02/05 2:36 PM
Default Entered (kw, ) |
||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 10/04 3:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ian Poush re: served Summons and Complaint upon Yvette Grundy by Personal on 10/01/2018 (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/25 3:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEORGE GRUNDY; jury demand, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(kw, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (2) | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/25 3:41 PM
(1) Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to GEORGE GRUNDY. Forwarded To: counsel on 9/25/18. (kw, ) |
||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 07/20 9:41 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION5 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/26/2018 TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON JOHN DOE DEFENDANT. (SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER) ON 07/18/2018; 07/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/17 2:34 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Serve Defendant with Summons and Complaint filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC..(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 05/01 4:19 PM
ORDER THAT PLFF MAY SERVE THE INTERNET SERVICE PROVIDER (ISP) COMCAST CABLE WITH A RULE 45 SUBPOENA COMMANDING THE ISP TO PROVIDE PLFF WITH INFORMATION LISTED TO THE MINIMUM IFORMATION NECESSARY TO DISCLOSE THE JOHN DOE DEFT'S IDENTITY SUCH THAT SERVICE OF A SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT MAY BE EFFECTUATED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/30/18.5/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 04/23 3:23 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.Memorandum.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Memorandum | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Thu 04/19 10:30 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(rf, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/19 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE176978.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC., JURY TRIAL DEMAND, EXHIBITS(rf, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 04/19 10:29 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (rf, ) |