USA v. Lint
Washington Western District Court | |
Case #: | 3:18-cr-05152 |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 20, 2018 12:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allen D Lint (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/20/2018 1:52 AM PDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
Arrest of Allen D Lint on 4/4/2018. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | ||
1 | 1 20 pgs COMPLAINT as to Allen D Lint (1). (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
Case unsealed as to Allen D Lint per the defendant's arrest. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | ||
3 | 3 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/4/2018 as to Allen D Lint. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
6 | 6 MOTION for Detention Order by USA as to Allen D Lint. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
7 | 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J Richard Creatura- CRD: K Miller ; AUSA: Andre Penalver for Thomas Woods ; Def Cnsl: Ret: Bryan Hershman ; PTS: Nick Bassett ; Time of Hearing: 3:15 PM ; Courtroom: D ; Session #: TAC180405 ; INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Allen D Lint held on 4/5/2018. Defendant advised of rights and the charge. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in D Courtroom before Judge J Richard Creatura. Preliminary Examination set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in D Courtroom before Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
8 | 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/4/2018 as to Allen D Lint. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bryan G Hershman appearing for Defendant Allen D Lint. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
11 | 11 DEMAND for Disclosure of Material Favorable to the Defense by Defendant Allen D Lint. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
12 | 12 SEALED DOCUMENT Mitigation Materials by Allen D Lint - Character Attestation Letters, (2) Photographs, Certificate of Marriage, Dr Appointments and Visits, Health Summary, Appointment Desk, Current Lease. Document filed under seal per personal information contained within. (Cc: Cnsl) (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
13 | 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J Richard Creatura- CRD: K Miller ; AUSA: Thomas Woods ; Def Cnsl: Ret: Bryan Hershman ; PTS: Nick Bassett ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM ; Courtroom: D ; Session #: TAC180409 ; DETENTION HEARING as to Allen D Lint held on 4/9/2018. Parties stipulate to release but discuss additional conditions to impose beyond Pretrial Services' recommendations. Defendant placed on bond. (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
14 | 14 Appearance Bond (PR) entered as to Allen D Lint (1). (cc: PTS/USPO/USMO) (KAM) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joseph C. Silvio appearing for USA. (Silvio, Joseph) [3:18-mj-05085-JRC] | |
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Allen D Lint (1) counts 1, 2. (AQ) | |
Att: 1 Status Sheet | ||
17 | 17 SEALED Signature Page to16 Indictment as to Allen D Lint. (AQ) | |
18 | 18 ORDER CONTINUING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Allen D Lint by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. cc: USMO; (AQ) | |
19 | 19 Letter scheduling arraignment for defendant Allen D Lint. Arraignment set for 4/30/2018 at 01:30 PM in D Courtroom before Judge J Richard Creatura. (Silvio, Joseph) |