POCAHONTAS COUNTY COMMISSION v. Purdue Pharmaceutical Products, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45443 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Northern, 2:18-cv-00034 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:36 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West Ward Pharmaceutical Corp
|
|
Defendant
Teva Sales and Marketing, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceutical Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Pocahontas County Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:48 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 133 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by POCAHONTAS COUNTY COMMISSION.(njz) Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2555370 [Transferred from wvnd on 4/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Pocahontas County Resolution on the Opioid Epidemic, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio re MDL 2804. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (njz) [Transferred from wvnd on 4/19/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-22) - 17 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ALM/2:18-cv-00362, 1 in ALM/2:18-cv-00381, 1 in ALN/6:18-cv-00531, 2 in ALN/7:18-cv-00462, 1 in FLN/5:18-cv-00086, 1 in FLN/5:18-cv-00087, 1 in KS/6:18-cv-01109, 1 in KS/6:18-cv-01110, 1 in LAE/2:18-cv-03457, 1 in MA/1:18-cv-10643, 1175 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in OKN/4:18-cv-00180, 1 in OR/3:18-cv-00520, 1 in TNW/1:18-cv-02220, 1 in WIW/3:18-cv-00228, 1 in WVN/2:18-cv-00034, 1 in WVN/3:18-cv-00044, 1 in WY/2:18-cv-00057) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/18/2018. (njz) [Transferred from wvnd on 4/19/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Northern. Case number 2:18-cv-00034. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |