Cherokee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45452 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kansas, 6:18-cv-01110 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:36 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SAJ Distributors
|
|
Defendant
McQueary Brothers Drug Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cherokee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/26/2019 3:20 PM EST |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 161 pgs COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4445732), filed by Cherokee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Prochaska, Ryan) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Cherokee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Prochaska, Ryan) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | |
3 | 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Cherokee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners - trial to be held in Wichita. (Prochaska, Ryan) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all further proceedings. District Judge Eric F. Melgren no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/18/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aa) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio.(aa) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio (MDL 2804). (aa) [Transferred from ksd on 4/19/2018.] | |
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 6:18-cv-01110. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |