Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01474
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2018
Terminated:May 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
8minuteenergy SPV1 LLC
Represented By
8minuteenergy SPV1 LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 05/12 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1474 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
17 17 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #16 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
16 16 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
15 15 notice Notice, Dismissal Thu 09/05 11:03 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, April 12, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit Fri 04/12 6:16 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Friday, March 01, 2019
13 13 other Certificate, Service Fri 03/01 1:31 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Michael D. Hamersky on behalf of 8minutenergy SPV1 LLC, 8minutenergy SPV2 LLC. (Hamersky, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 ,11
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
12 12 plan Disclosure Statement Wed 02/27 8:35 PM
Disclosure Statement filed by Michael D. Hamersky on behalf of 8minutenergy SPV1 LLC, 8minutenergy SPV2 LLC. (Hamersky, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 ans Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 02/27 8:32 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Michael D. Hamersky on behalf of 8minutenergy SPV1 LLC, 8minutenergy SPV2 LLC.(Hamersky, Michael)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/13 12:28 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Third Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 11/13 11:26 AM
Third Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against 8minutenergy SPV1 LLC ; 8minutenergy SPV2 LLC . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 12, 2018
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/12 11:41 AM
Amended Complaint against 8minutenergy SPV2 LLC, 8minutenergy SPV1 LLC (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 11/12 11:43 AM
Request for a Third Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
7 7 answer None Thu 10/25 1:16 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Michael D. Hamersky on behalf of 8minuteenergy SPV1 LLC. (Hamersky, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 11:53 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 3:54 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Thursday, June 28, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/28 2:24 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against 8minuteenergy SPV1 LLC. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 06/26 6:32 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 10:45 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Thursday, April 19, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 04/19 4:02 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/19 3:56 PM
Adversary case 18-01474 Complaint against 8minuteenergy SPV1 LLC to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]