Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01488
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Nov 22, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Far East Cable Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Far East Cable Co. Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, November 22, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/22 12:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1488 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
20 20 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Fri 11/22 12:22 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 11/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
19 19 misc PDF Notice Tue 11/19 11:14 AM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 order Judgment Tue 11/19 11:13 AM
Judgment signed on 11/19/2019. Judgment entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Far East Cable Co. Ltd., in a total judgment as of $80,084.12 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 19,0075 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, November 14, 2019
17 17 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 11/14 5:38 PM
Order signed on 11/14/2019 for Default Judgment. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, October 11, 2019
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/11 6:23 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, October 07, 2019
15 15 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Mon 10/07 3:15 PM
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 11/1/19 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 10/29/19 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2019 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/29/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 10/07 3:13 PM
Affidavit of Service Of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trusts Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, July 22, 2019
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 07/22 8:31 PM
Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding Entry of Default Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
12 12 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 07/03 2:45 PM
Affidavit of Service of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 9
Sunday, June 30, 2019
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 07/01 12:22 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 06/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Friday, June 28, 2019
10 10 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/28 9:35 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Far East Cable Co. Ltd. Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
9 9 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 06/26 10:41 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 2nd Summons, Complaint and Affidavit of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/01 9:22 AM
Certificate of Service regarding service of 1st Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference, and Hague Convention Notice Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
Friday, April 12, 2019
7 7 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 4:03 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
6 6 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 1:14 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 07/03 10:09 AM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Far East Cable Co. Ltd.. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/29 7:05 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/18 12:59 PM
Amended Complaint against Far East Cable Co. Ltd. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 8:47 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Friday, April 20, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 04/20 10:54 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/20 9:56 AM
Adversary case 18-01488 Complaint against Far East Cable Co. Ltd. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 04/20 2:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01488 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12540135. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1