Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01502
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shanghai Zhichuan Electronic Tech
Represented By
Shanghai Zhichuan Electronic Tech
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/14 2:30 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1502 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
17 17 order Judgment Tue 06/22 5:34 PM
Judgment signed on 6/22/2021. Judgment entered against Defendant Shanghai Zhichuan Electronic Tech, in a total judgment of $41,238.00 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 21,0045 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 order Motion, Default Judgment Tue 06/22 12:20 PM
Order Signed on 6/22/2021 Granting the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against the Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
15 15 notice Notice, Withdrawal Wed 06/16 2:52 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document No. 13 Related [+] filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk, LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/15 7:24 PM
Affidavit of Service of Seth Botos Regarding Letter to The Honorable David S. Jones Regarding Motion for Default Judgement Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk, LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/15 4:22 PM
Affidavit of Service of Seth Botos Regarding Letter to The Honorable David S. Jones Regarding Motion for Default Judgement Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk, LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, June 11, 2021
12 12 misc Letter Fri 06/11 2:33 PM
Letter to The Honorable David S. Jones Regarding Motion for Default Judgement Related [+] Filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 28, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/28 10:48 AM
Order Signed on 5/28/2021 Directing Supplemental Statement in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against the Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 05/25 7:43 PM
Affidavit of Service of Seth Botos Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action [Adv. Pro. No. 18-01502 Docket No. 7], Certification of No Objection Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action [Adv. Pro. No. 18-01502 Docket No. 9], Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action [Adv. Pro. No. 18-01464 Docket No. 11], Certification of No Objection Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action [Adv. Pro. No. 18-01464 Docket No. 13], Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action [Adv. Pro. No. 18-01464 , and Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action [Adv. Pro. No. 18-01507 Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk, LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 7 ,9
Thursday, May 20, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Thu 05/20 4:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant for Failure to Comply With the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action Related [+] Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 04/21 3:32 PM
Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend itself in this Action Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk, LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 16, 2021
7 7 motion Motion, Default Judgment Fri 04/16 12:12 PM
Motion for Default Judgment (Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant for Failure to Comply with the Avoidance Action Procedures or Otherwise Defend Itself in this Action) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with hearing to be held on 5/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (DSJ) Responses due by 5/18/2021, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Tsukerman Declaration
Att: 4 General Order M-543
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
5 5 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 11:54 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Monday, June 04, 2018
3 3 answer None Mon 06/04 1:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Shanghai Zhichuan Electronic Tech. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, April 20, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 04/20 11:26 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/20 10:20 AM
Adversary case 18-01502 Complaint against Shanghai Zhichuan Electronic Tech to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 04/20 2:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01502 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12540135. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1