Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01508
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Nov 22, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sunlight Solar Energy
Represented By
Sunlight Solar Energy
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, November 22, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/22 12:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1508 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
20 20 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Fri 11/22 12:22 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 11/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
19 19 misc PDF Notice Tue 11/19 12:32 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 order Judgment Tue 11/19 12:31 PM
Judgment signed on 11/19/2019. Judgment entered that Plaintiff, SunEdison Litigation Trust, be and hereby is awarded a default judgment against Defendant, Sunlight Solar Energy, in a total judgment as of $23,306.20 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 19,0081 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, November 14, 2019
17 17 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 11/14 5:49 PM
Order signed on 11/14/2019 for Default Judgment. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, October 11, 2019
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/11 6:51 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, October 07, 2019
15 15 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Mon 10/07 11:17 AM
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 11/1/19 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: 10/29/19 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2019 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/29/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/11 5:56 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding Entry of Default Judgement Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 11
Sunday, June 02, 2019
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Sun 06/02 11:19 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 10
Saturday, June 01, 2019
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Sun 06/02 12:25 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Thursday, May 30, 2019
11 11 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/30 3:23 PM
Clerk's Entry Of Default Against Sunlight Solar Energy, Related [+] . (Mercado, Tracey)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
10 10 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 05/29 2:24 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Application for Certificate of Default) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust.(Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Application for Certificate of Default
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 2nd Summons, 3rd Summons, Complaint, COS and Suppl. COS
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Default
Friday, April 12, 2019
9 9 motion Motion, Extend Time Fri 04/12 5:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Third Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/7/2019,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
8 8 motion Motion, Extend Time Tue 10/09 2:38 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Second Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 11/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/30/2018,. (Tsukerman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/14 3:33 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Third Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 6 ,1
6 6 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Tue 08/14 1:59 PM
Third Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Sunlight Solar Energy . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 08/14 12:11 PM
Request for a Third Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
5 5 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 12:29 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Friday, June 08, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/08 2:35 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 05/30 3:05 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Sunlight Solar Energy . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 05/30 10:54 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 04/20 11:29 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/20 10:30 AM
Adversary case 18-01508 Complaint against Sunlight Solar Energy to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 04/20 2:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01508 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12540135. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1