Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01522
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Apr 28, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Verizon
Represented By
Verizon
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Business Network Services Inc.
Represented By
Verizon Business Network Services Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Wireless
Represented By
Verizon Wireless
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/28 9:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1522 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
16 16 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 04/26 5:14 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Daniel F.X. Geoghan on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Geoghan, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
14 14 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
13 13 misc Affidavit Thu 11/29 2:48 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Monday, October 29, 2018
12 12 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Mon 10/29 5:00 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon Wireless. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-] 3
11 11 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Mon 10/29 4:59 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon Communications Singapore Pte. Ltd.. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-] 3
10 10 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Mon 10/29 4:58 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon Communications Inc.. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-] 3
9 9 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Mon 10/29 4:57 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon Business Network Services Inc.. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-] 3
8 8 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Mon 10/29 4:55 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-] 3
7 7 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/29 8:41 AM
Order Signed On 10/26/2018 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Darrell W. Clark Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, October 25, 2018
6 6 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 10/25 4:50 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Darrell W. Clark filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Communications Singapore Pte. Ltd., Verizon Wireless. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 10/25 4:53 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 18-01522 smb] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A12840139. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,3
Friday, June 29, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Fri 06/29 1:43 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Verizon ; Verizon Business Network Services Inc. ; Verizon Communications Inc. ; Verizon Communications Singapore Pte. Ltd. Answer Due: 7/30/2018; Verizon Wireless . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/28 6:39 PM
Amended Complaint against Verizon Communications Singapore Pte. Ltd., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Wireless (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Thu 06/28 6:53 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 04/20 12:21 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/20 11:34 AM
Adversary case 18-01522 Complaint against Verizon, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Wireless to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 04/20 2:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01522 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12540135. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1