Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01524
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:May 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aramark Uniform Services
Represented By
Aramark Uniform Services
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 13, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/13 3:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1524 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 14, 2019
10 10 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Thu 02/14 10:19 AM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Leslie A. Berkoff. (Berkoff, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Wed 02/13 5:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
8 8 misc Affidavit Tue 09/04 4:48 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Thursday, August 23, 2018
7 7 answer Answer, Amended Complaint Thu 08/23 1:41 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Cullen D Speckhart on behalf of Aramark Uniform Services. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, July 20, 2018
6 6 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/20 4:52 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Cullen D Speckhart on behalf of Aramark Uniform Services. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/27 4:20 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 4 ,3
Friday, June 22, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Fri 06/22 4:14 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Aramark Uniform Services . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/22 12:04 PM
Amended Complaint against Aramark Uniform Services (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Fri 06/22 1:35 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 04/20 12:21 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/20 11:55 AM
Adversary case 18-01524 Complaint against Aramark Uniform Services to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 04/20 2:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01524 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12540135. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1