Connecticut District Court
Judge:Vanessa L Bryant
Case #: 3:18-cv-00683
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 17, 2018 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Arciero
Represented By
Kristan M. Maccini
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Clark
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Town of Canton
Represented By
Kristan M. Maccini
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Clark
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Colangelo
Represented By
Kristan M. Maccini
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Clark
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Adam Gompper
Represented By
Kristan M. Maccini
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Clark
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Calvin Nodine
Represented By
David A. Moraghan
Smith, Keefe, Moraghan & Waterfall, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Nodine's Smokehouse, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth K. Acee
Leclairryan-Nh
contact info
Defendant
Mark J. Penney
Represented By
Kristan M. Maccini
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Clark
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Chase
Represented By
Mary-Kate Georgette Smith
Law Office Of Lewis Chimes LLC
contact info
Lewis H. Chimes
Law Office Of Lewis Chimes LLC
contact info
Katie Ann Roy
Robert Fortgang Assoc.
contact info

GPO Jan 22 2019
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum of Decision, Counts 15, 18, 20, 21, 22 and 24 are DISMISSED. Additionally, Counts 14 and 17 are dismissed as to Sergeant Penney. Plaintiff's section 1983 personal capacity and state and common law claims for false and arrest and malicious prosecution (Counts 14, 16, 17, and 19), as well as her intentional infliction of emotional distress claim (Count 23) will proceed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/22/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
GPO Apr 03 2019
ORDER granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint for the reasons in the attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
GPO Apr 03 2019
ORDER regarding the Court's in camera document review. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
GPO Jun 06 2019
ORDER granting 99 Motion to Compel Town Defendants to Produce Privilege Log; denying 100 Motion to Compel Town Defendants to Produce Additional Information Re: Cases Handled by Defendants Colangelo and Gompper for the reasons in the attached ruling. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/6/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 17, 2024
appeal Appeal Record Returned Tue 06/18 2:02 PM
Appeal Record Returned re:201 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ECF Nos.44 and45 returned. (Bozek, M)
Related: [-]