California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:18-cv-00669
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2018
Terminated:Dec 31, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 17, 2018 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Maureen M Michail
Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuch And Lebovits LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Rebel Ely
Represented By
Jonathan Dwork
Law Offices Of Jonathan Dwork PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Monday, December 31, 2018
15 15 order Dismissing Case Thu 01/03 4:03 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case14 . (see document for information). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
14 14 stip Dismiss Case Wed 12/19 9:39 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement and stipulation filed by plaintiff Rebel Ely.(Dwork, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 09, 2018
13 13 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/09 3:24 PM
ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT DATES by Judge James V. Selna (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
12 12 4 pgs stip Order Fri 07/06 11:32 AM
STIPULATION for Order re Case Management Dates filed by defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Michail, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Case Management Dates
Monday, July 02, 2018
11 11 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 07/02 11:36 AM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (kt)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Mon 07/02 11:24 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 11:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/10/2019 at 8:30 AM. The Court directs counsel to meet, confer and submit, within 7 days, a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the remainder of the case management dates as referenced on Exhibit A of the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference (See Document for Further Details and Deadlines) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
9 9 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 06/22 3:11 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiff Rebel Ely.. (Dwork, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 05/25 11:43 AM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for MONDAY, 7/2/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with a completed Exhibit A, by 6/25/2018. (kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 05/15 3:06 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only6 Assigned to Judge Selna served on 05/15/2018. (Michail, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
6 6 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/09 3:17 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 04/23 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/23 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/20 5:31 PM
Notice and Certificate of Interested Persons or Entities of Interested Parties filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company, (Michail, Maureen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/20 5:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Michail, Maureen)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/20 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018 00965179-CU-IC-CXC Receipt No: 0973-21626126 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attorney Maureen M Michail added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Michail, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/23 4:32 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Does 1 to 100, Inclusive., filed by Plaintiff Rebel Ely. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/3/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO.11 (et)
Related: [-]