Massachusetts District Court
Judge:George A Otoole, Jr
Case #: 1:18-cv-10801
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Oct 21, 2018 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Cape Cod Hospital
Represented By
Anthony D. Rizzotti
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Melissa L. McDonagh
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Richard J. Marks
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
James Happel
Represented By
Anthony D. Rizzotti
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Melissa L. McDonagh
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Richard J. Marks
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Artis
Represented By
Simon B. Mann
Mann Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Thursday, May 23, 2019
33 33 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/23 11:34 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gloria Artis. (Mann, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 03/07 1:16 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by James Happel.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
31 31 utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/15 9:54 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery to be completed by 4/19/2019 (Lyness, Paul) Modified on 2/15/2019 (Lyness, Paul)
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/15 9:53 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2019 re22 MOTION to Compel filed by Cape Cod Hospital,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by James Happel, The motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. The defendant is instructed to answer the amended complaint within twenty-one(21) days. The motion to compel is GRANTED in part. The plaintiff is ordered to respond to the defendants outstanding discovery requests and provide an executed form authorizing the release of the plaintiffs medical records via electronic communication by March 1, 2019. The plaintiffs failure to comply with the Courts order to produce discovery could result in substantial sanctions, including dismissal of the case. The close of discovery is now April 19, 2019.Motions terminated:22 MOTION to Compel filed by Cape Cod Hospital,29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions filed by Cape Cod Hospital,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by James Happel. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: No Appearance by the plaintiff; For Defendant: Melissa McDonagh) (Lyness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/24 3:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions by Cape Cod Hospital.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
28 28 8 pgs order Order Thu 01/24 11:28 AM
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered. STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER(Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 01/24 11:27 AM
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting21 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
26 26 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/17 2:32 PM
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: Electronic Order entered DENYING25 Motion for New Hearing Date on Motion to Compel. If necessary, the discovery schedule can be extended. (Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/10 1:50 PM
MOTION for New Hearing Date on Motion to Compel by Cape Cod Hospital.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 04, 2019
24 24 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Fri 01/04 1:26 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion21 Joint MOTION for Protective Order ,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ,22 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
23 23 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 12/21 5:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION to Compel filed by Cape Cod Hospital.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Melissa McDonagh,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Interrogatories to Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Requests for Production to Plaintiff,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Deposition Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Emails,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Deposition Re-notice,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Email
22 22 motion Compel Fri 12/21 5:11 PM
MOTION to Compel by Cape Cod Hospital.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 12, 2018
21 21 motion Protective Order Mon 11/12 5:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cape Cod Hospital.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Proposed Protective Order
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/31 1:39 PM
REPLY to Response to10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by James Happel. (McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/24 1:02 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Lyness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/23 5:02 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 1, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by James Happel.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 22, 2018
17 17 respm Opposition to Motion Mon 10/22 12:07 PM
Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Gloria Artis.(Mann, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, October 01, 2018
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/02 10:02 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2018. Plaintiff to file opposition to motion to dismiss (10) by 10/15/18; Defendant to file any reply by 10/25/18. Service of initial disclosures by 10/15/18; ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2018., Fact Discovery to be completed by 2/1/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 3/8/2019;Opposition to dispositive motions by 4/8/19; Replies, if any, by 4/22/19;). (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiff: Simon Mann; For Defendant: Melissa McDonagh) (Lyness, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
15 15 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 09/21 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Cape Cod Hospital and James Happel . (McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/20 1:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cape Cod Hospital. (McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Thu 09/20 1:15 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/21 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Marks on behalf of Cape Cod Hospital, James Happel (Marks, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
11 11 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 08/20 4:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by James Happel.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Second Charge
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/20 4:18 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by James Happel.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Mon 08/20 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/20 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Rizzotti on behalf of Cape Cod Hospital, James Happel (Rizzotti, Anthony)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 08/20 7:46 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Cape Cod Hospital.(McDonagh, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/27 2:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gloria Artis. (Mann, Simon)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 06/08 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to James Happel. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
4 4 12 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/18 9:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cape Cod Hospital, filed by Gloria Artis.(Mann, Simon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/25 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Cape Cod Hospital. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Nici, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 04/25 4:29 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/24 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Cape Cod Hospital Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7108204 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gloria Artis.(Mann, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form