Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:18-mj-02629
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2018
Terminated:May 10, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 3:52 PM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anne McNamara
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sandra Ruballo (1)
Terminated: 05/10/2018
Represented By
Mycki L. Ratzan
Mycki Ratzan, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/28/2018 9:02 AM EST
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to Sandra Ruballo (1). (ch1)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Sandra Ruballo held on 4/25/2018. Bond set: Sandra Ruballo (1) Temporary PTD at Government request - risk of flight. Date of Arrest or Surrender: 4/25/18. Arraignment set for 5/9/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 4/26/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 5/9/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 4/26/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Attorney added: Mycki L. Ratzan for Sandra Ruballo. (Digital 14:25:39) Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/25/2018. (wc)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mycki L. Ratzan appearing for Sandra Ruballo (cg1)
Related: [-]