City of Guin, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45457 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 6:18-cv-00531 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:37 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Guin, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/11/2019 4:12 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 173 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Guin, Alabama.(PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/26/2018.] | |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601088282. related document1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Guin, Alabama.(PSM). (Mougey, Peter) Modified on 4/16/2018 (TLM, ). [Transferred from alnd on 4/26/2018.] | ||
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk mailed to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 4/26/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 6:18-cv-00531. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |