Jeffrey R. Werner et al v. Landon Dowlatsingh et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03560 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 24, 2018 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Landon Dowlatsingh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Incredible Features Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey R. Werner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
Thu 12/03 2:33 PM
BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $230.00 in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. RE: First APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff All Plaintiffs34 (kr) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/10 11:07 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,29 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order32 , CCA # 18-56349 The judgment of this Court, entered June 19, 2020, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $41.30. (car) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 07/01 1:34 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff. All Plaintiffs34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filing is premature. The USCA MANDATE has Not been issued to date (docket no. 32 is only a Memorandum. Note: Mandates issue 21 days after the 9th Circuit Memorandum. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
Wed 07/01 9:39 AM
First APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant-Appelle Landon Dowlatsingh. (Morton, Melinda) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Fri 06/19 10:55 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 18-56349 DISTRICT COURT DECISION IS AFFIRMED. (lc) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/25 3:54 PM
NOTICE Transcript Designation form G-126 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
30 | 30
transcript
Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Thu 10/25 3:25 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-56349 as to Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner for Court Reporter. Court will contact Leeah Banks at lbanks@higbeeassociates.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Fri 10/12 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction26 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22571148.) (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 10/12 4:02 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Naomi Manea Sarega counsel for Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. Adding Naomi M. Sarega as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner and Incredible Features Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Attorney Naomi Manea Sarega added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Naomi Manea Sarega added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Sarega, Naomi) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
15
pgs
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 09/24 9:10 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed closing report to Copyright Office. (lc) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
13
pgs
order
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 09/24 9:08 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION15 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lc) |
|
25 | 25
minutes
Telephone Conference Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 09/19 4:08 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(2)15 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held by telephone. Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The Court takes defendants motion under submission. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lc) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/14 8:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS JEFFERY R. WERNER, AND INCREDIBLE FEATURES INC. AND DEFENDANT LANDON DOWLATSINGHS JOINT REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC INSTRUCTIONS TO BE FOLLOWED)22 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 09/12 4:41 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Landon Dowlatsingh Miscellaneous Document22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request: Order. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event does not relief sought. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 09/12 1:49 PM
Joint Request to Appear Telephonically at the Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DKT. 15) filed by Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 15(Poorman, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 08/27 6:43 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 15 filed by Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh.(Morton, Melinda) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jacob K Poorman ISO Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Poorman Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Declaration of Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh ISO Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Mon 08/06 2:11 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re Stipulation to Continue,19 : Upon consideration of the stipulation and the parties' request for an continuance of the hearing, the Court finds there to be good cause for granting the request. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the hearing for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is continued to to September 17, 2018, at 10:00 A.M. Defendant shall file a Reply memorandum no later than August 27, 2018. (bm) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Continue
Fri 08/03 7:54 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue hearing date for Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction from August 20, 2018 to September 10, 2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 15 filed by Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner.(Carreon, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Lodging
Thu 08/02 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related)17 (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 08/02 12:38 PM
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 15 filed by Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner.(Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 07/19 5:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh, identifying Landon Productions, Inc.. (Morton, Melinda) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 07/19 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attorney Melinda Mae Morton added to party Landon Dowlatsingh(pty:dft)) (Morton, Melinda) |
|
Att: 1 Dowlatsingh Declaration ISO, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 06/14 2:28 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION EXTENDS TIME FOR DEFENDANT LANDON DOWLATSINGH TORESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JULY 19, 201813 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 06/13 12:05 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Landon Dowlatsingh answer now due 7/19/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner; Incredible Features Inc..(Carreon, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 05/24 8:17 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 05/21 1:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Landon Dowlatsingh answer now due 6/20/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner; Incredible Features Inc..(Carreon, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 05/03 7:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc., upon Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh served on 4/29/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Landon Dowlatsingh in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carreon, Ryan) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/27 2:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 04/27 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 04/27 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 04/27 12:31 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Carreon counsel for Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner and Incredible Features Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Werner and Incredible Features Inc.. (Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Carreon, Ryan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 04/27 12:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 04/27 12:28 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/27 12:27 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner, identifying Incredible Features, Inc.. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 04/27 12:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/27 12:25 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21659078 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc.. (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) |