ORANGE COUNTY v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45308 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:18-cv-00192 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:38 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Orange County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:37 PM EDT |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2309415.), filed by ORANGE COUNTY.(COATES, PAUL) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/30/2018.] | ||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the Order of 3/28/2018. Received and filed on 03/29/2018. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/30/2018.] | |
3 | 3 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-17) transferring this action to NDOH. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:18-cv-00192. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |