The City of Smithers, West Virginia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45319 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 21:0801 |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 2:18-cv-00441 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:40 PM EST |
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership I
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II
|
|
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Smithers, West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:18 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 38 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6286092. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/30/2018.] | |
2 | 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by The City of Smithers, West Virginia for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., re:1 Complaint. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons as to Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to Anda, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons as to CVS Indiana, L.L.C., | ||
Att: 5 Summons as to Keysource Medical, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons as to Kroger Limited Partnership I, | ||
Att: 7 Summons as to Kroger Limited Partnership II, | ||
Att: 8 Summons as to Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 10 Summons as to Miami-Luken, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Summons as to Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, | ||
Att: 12 Summons as to Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Summons as to The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., | ||
Att: 14 Summons as to Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 15 Summons as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP | ||
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons as to Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to Anda, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons as to CVS Indiana, L.L.C., | ||
Att: 5 Summons as to Keysource Medical, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons as to Kroger Limited Partnership I, | ||
Att: 7 Summons as to Kroger Limited Partnership II, | ||
Att: 8 Summons as to Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 10 Summons as to Miami-Luken, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Summons as to Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, | ||
Att: 12 Summons as to Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Summons as to The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., | ||
Att: 14 Summons as to Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 15 Summons as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP | ||
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-17), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/28/2018. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/30/2018.] | |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00441. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |