Case Filed:Apr 27, 2018
Defendant
Mikhail Kokorich
Movant
12BF-RNC Strategic Recources Fund, L.P.
Movant
Alexander Kushaev
Movant
Ambercroft Trading Limited
Movant
Astro Digital US, Inc.
Movant
Canopus Systems US LLC, a California limited liability company
Movant
Damir Begishev
Movant
Daura Geo Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Movant
Dauria Aerospace Holding Ltd, Cyprus
Movant
Dauria Holding International Ltd, BVI
Movant
Dmitri Kushaev
Movant
Dmitry Khan
Movant
Dmitry Kushaev
Movant
Glounec Investments
Movant
Manfred Krischke
Movant
Mikhail Kokorich
Movant
Sergey Ivanov
Movant
Soval Investment S.A.
Respondent
Astro Digital US, Inc
Respondent
Damir Begishev

GPO Jun 11 2018
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceeding. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
GPO Oct 03 2018
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 10 Motion to Intervene; denying 10 Motion to Quash. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 05, 2018
38 38 14 pgs order Protective Order Tue 11/06 3:30 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 34 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/5/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
37 37 order Order Thu 11/01 3:15 PM
ORDER requiring Chambers Copy re: 34 35 . The Court still has not received a chambers copy of these documents. The party shall lodge a copy of all documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within three days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
36 36 order Order Fri 10/26 11:04 AM
ORDER requiring Chambers Copy re: 34 35 . The Court did not receive a chambers copy of these documents. The party shall lodge a copy of all documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within three days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 20, 2018
35 35 18 pgs oth_sup Declaration in Support Sat 10/20 7:15 AM
Declaration of John C. Brown in Support of34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order (Modified) filed byAstro Digital US, Inc. Related [+] (Brown, John)
Related: [-] 34
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Sat 10/20 7:14 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order (Modified) filed by Astro Digital US, Inc., Ambercroft Trading Limited (Brown, John) Modified on 10/21/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 10/20 7:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Calvin Brown, III for Respondent Astro Digital US, Inc. (Brown, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
32 32 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion to Quash Wed 10/03 4:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 10 Motion to Intervene; denying 10 Motion to Quash. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/03 4:54 PM
In light of the 32 order on the motion to intervene and quash, the October 4, 2018 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/3/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
31 31 order Order Tue 09/18 10:30 AM
ORDER requiring Chambers Copy re: 26 27 28 29 30 . The Court did not receive a chambers copy of this document. The party shall lodge a copy of all documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within two days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/18/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
30 30 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 09/10 2:27 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re26 Reply to Opposition/Response, -- Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Mikhail Kokorich's Reply to Opposition in Support of Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 26
29 29 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 09/10 2:25 PM
Declaration of Tameka Davis in Support of26 Reply to Opposition/Response, -- Declaration of Tameka Davis in Support of Reply to Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 26
28 28 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 09/10 2:22 PM
Declaration of Sharon Z. Weiss in Support of26 Reply to Opposition/Response, -- Declaration of Sharon Z. Weiss in Support of Reply to Mikhail Kokorich's Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 26
27 27 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 09/10 2:20 PM
Declaration of John C. Brown in Support of26 Reply to Opposition/Response, -- Declaration of John C. Brown in Support of Reply to Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 20 pgs respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 09/10 2:18 PM
REPLY Related [+] -- Reply to Opposition to Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed byMikhail Kokorich. (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas
Friday, August 10, 2018
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 08/10 1:14 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 24 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule. Replies due by 9/10/2018. (sisS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 08/08 12:23 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Mikhail Kokorich.(Daghbandan, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
23 23 oth_sup Declaration in Opposition Wed 08/01 4:59 PM
DECLARATION of DMITRI KUSHAEV in Opposition to10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed byAmbercroft Trading Limited. Related [+] (Miller, Donald)
Related: [-] 10
22 22 oth_sup Declaration in Opposition Wed 08/01 4:57 PM
DECLARATION of ROSALIND NICHOLSON in Opposition to10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed byAmbercroft Trading Limited. Related [+] (Miller, Donald)
Related: [-] 10
21 21 oth_sup Declaration in Opposition Wed 08/01 4:55 PM
DECLARATION of JENNIFER JASON in Opposition to10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed byAmbercroft Trading Limited. Related [+] (Miller, Donald)
Related: [-] 10
20 20 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 08/01 4:51 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byAmbercroft Trading Limited. (Miller, Donald)
Related: [-] 10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Tue 07/03 2:53 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas -- Amended Notice of Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed by Mikhail Kokorich. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/1/2018. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 07/03 8:35 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 17 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule. Replies due by 8/22/2018. Opposition due by 8/1/2018. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/03 8:35 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas . Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (sisS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 06/29 4:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoenas -- Stipulation to Set Hearing and Modify Briefing Schedule for Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas, with Proof of Service filed by Mikhail Kokorich.(Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 06/27 10:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Given that Motion to Intervene and Motion to Quash10 , was noticed for a hearing date when the Judge is unavailable, counsel must re-notice not re-file the Motion to Intervene and Motion to Quash. Hearing date of September 6, 2018, is vacated. Counsel should check the Judge's scheduling notes for available dates. (This is a text only docket entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 06/27 10:09 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mikhail Kokorich re13 Declaration in Support,10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash -- Notice of Motion and Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ,11 Declaration in Support,14 Certificate of Interested Entities,,,12 Declaration in Support, -- Proof of Service (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 06/27 10:06 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Mikhail Kokorich identifying Corporate Parent Dauria Holding International Ltd, BVI, Corporate Parent 12BF-RNC Strategic Recources Fund, L.P., Corporate Parent Dauria Aerospace Holding Ltd, Cyprus, Corporate Parent Daura Geo Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Canopus Systems US LLC, a California limited liability company, Other Affiliate Ambercroft Trading Limited, Other Affiliate Mikhail Kokorich, Other Affiliate Glounec Investments, Other Affiliate Sergey Ivanov, Other Affiliate Manfred Krischke, Other Affiliate Dmitry Khan, Other Affiliate Dmitry Kushaev, Other Affiliate Astro Digital US, Inc., Other Affiliate Damir Begishev for Mikhail Kokorich. -- Mikhail Kokorich's Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Local Rule 3-15 (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 06/27 9:54 AM
Declaration of Mikhail Kokorich in Support of10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash -- Notice of Motion and Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities -- Declaration of Mikhail Kokorich in Support of Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 10
12 12 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 06/27 9:51 AM
Declaration of Tameka Davis in Support of10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash -- Notice of Motion and Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities -- Declaration of Tameka Davis in Support of Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 06/27 9:49 AM
Declaration of Sharon Z. Weiss in Support of10 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash -- Notice of Motion and Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities -- Declaration of Sharon Z. Weiss in Support of Mikhail Kokorich's Motion to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas filed byMikhail Kokorich. Related [+] (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Intervene Quash Wed 06/27 9:47 AM
MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Quash -- Notice of Motion and Motion of Mikhail Kokorich to Intervene and Quash Subpoenas; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Mikhail Kokorich. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/11/2018. Replies due by 7/18/2018.(Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 11, 2018
9 9 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/11 9:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceeding. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
8 8 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 06/01 11:59 AM
Letter from Defendant Mikhail Kokorich to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore . (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 04/30 2:35 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ambercroft Trading Limited (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 04/30 2:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ambercroft Trading Limited (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/30 2:32 PM
Proposed Order re1 MOTION for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1782(a) to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding by Ambercroft Trading Limited. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 04/30 2:31 PM
Declaration of Oleg Stolyar in Support of1 MOTION for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1782(a) to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding filed by Ambercroft Trading Limited. Related [+] (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
3 3 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 04/30 2:29 PM
Declaration of Oliver Clifton in Support of1 MOTION for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1782(a) to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding filed by Ambercroft Trading Limited. Related [+] (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
2 2 15 pgs oth_sup Memorandum in Support Mon 04/30 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of1 MOTION for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1782(a) to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding filed by Ambercroft Trading Limited. Related [+] (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 5 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/30 2:26 PM
MOTION for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1782(a) to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding filed by Ambercroft Trading Limited. Responses due by 5/11/2018. Replies due by 5/18/2018.(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D