Worthington Energy, Inc.
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher B Latham |
Case #: | 3:18-bk-02702 |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Worthington Energy, Inc.
6136 Mission Gorge Rd Ste 111
San Diego, CA 92120-3444 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Closing Chapter 11 Dismissed Case
Thu 07/26 10:56 AM
Order Closing Case. An order dismissing has been entered by the Court, and notice of the dismissal has been given to the debtor(s) and all creditors and all other required documentation having been entered; therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the within case be and the same is hereby closed . Barry K. Lander, Clerk (Bobis, T.) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Thu 07/19 9:20 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 07/19/2018. (Admin.) |
|
39 | 39
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Notice of Dismissal
Thu 07/19 9:20 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Notice of Entry of Order Dismissing Case and Vacating All Automatic Stays and Injunctions. Notice Date 07/19/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Dismissing Bankruptcy Case (Order)(CSD 1240) (BNC)
Tue 07/17 12:07 PM
Order Regarding Dismissal of Bankruptcy Case as to Debtor Worthington Energy, Inc. . ; with BNC Service. ,[ 32] signed on 7/16/2018. (Bobis, T.) |
|
37 | 37
order
Virtual Minute Order (paperless entry) - manual entry
Mon 07/16 2:12 PM
Virtual Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 07/16/2018. MATTER: MOTION TO CONVERT CASE FROM CHAPTER 11 TO CHAPTER 7, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS THE CASE FILED BY DEBTOR. DISPOSITION: Tentative Ruling affirmed & adopted. Appearances excused. (McGrew, J.) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
court
Tentative Ruling (BNC)
Fri 07/13 2:15 PM
Tentative Ruling. Department 5: Hearing Date and Time: 07/16/2018 @ 02:30 PM (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Claims Bar Date (Ch11)(Notice)
Mon 07/02 3:21 PM
Claims Bar Date. Proof of Claims due by 6/14/2018, (Chaco, J.) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp]
Mon 06/04 10:46 AM
Debtor's Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. re Motion to convert to Chapter 7 filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc.. HEARING Scheduled for 7/16/2018 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 6/4/2018. Opposition due on 06/18/2018 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
33 | 33
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Mon 06/04 10:41 AM
Receipt of Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to 7([LINK 18-02702 CL11] ) [motion,1510] ( 15.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 15.00 Receipt number A14067372 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Convert Case from Chapter 11 to 7 (Motion) (fee)
Mon 06/04 10:38 AM
Debtor's Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to 7 Fee Amount $ 15 filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Tue 05/29 5:35 PM
Receipt of Amendment Filing Fee - $31.00 by RP. Receipt Number 232749. (Admin.) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Creditors Added by Amendment (Notice) (CSD 1101)
Tue 05/29 3:13 PM
Notice to Creditors of the Above-Named Debtor Added by Amendment or Balance of Schedules with Proof of Service filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. . (Bobis, T.) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Amendment (CSD 1100)(fee)
Tue 05/29 3:12 PM
Amendment to Schedule D-F, and/or Matrix, and/or list of Creditors or Equity Holders, & Proof of Service. Fee Amount $ 31.00 filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. . (Bobis, T.) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Fri 05/25 9:23 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 05/25/2018. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
court
Errors/Deficiencies (BNC)
Wed 05/23 9:32 AM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Proof of Claim No. 2, Employment Development Department. (Bobis, T.) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order - manual entry
Thu 05/24 5:19 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 05/21/2018. MATTER: STATUS CONFERENCE ON CHAPTER 11 PETITION (fr. 5/16/18). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. HEARING RE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISCLOSURE STATEMENT & PLAN CONFIRMATION (*HRG HOLD DATE) Scheduled for 7/30/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. (McGrew, J.) |
|
Saturday, May 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Claims Bar Date (Ch11)(Notice)
Sat 05/12 11:18 AM
Debtor's Amended Notice of Fixing Claims Bar Date filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc.. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Claims Bar Date (Ch11)(Notice)
Fri 05/11 4:20 PM
Debtor's Notice of Fixing Claims Bar Date of June 14, 2018 filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc.. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Special Notice (Request) (paperless entry)
Fri 05/11 11:04 AM
Request for Special Notice Securities and Exchange Commission, Brookfield Place, 200 Vesey Street, Suite 400, New York, NY 10281 filed by Neal Jacobson on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Jacobson, Neal) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Sat 05/12 9:16 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 05/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Sat 05/12 9:16 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 05/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Sat 05/12 9:16 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 05/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing (Notice) (CSD 1188 & 3025)(BNC)
Thu 05/10 10:21 AM
Notice of Change in Date & Time Fixed for Hearing -- STATUS CONFERENCE ON CHAPTER 11 PETITION Scheduled for 5/21/2018 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. (McGrew, J.) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Employ (Order)
Thu 05/10 7:48 AM
COURT MODIFIED Order On Amended Application to Employ Bankruptcy Counsel; with Service by BNC signed on 5/9/2018. (Bobis, T.) |
|
17 | 17
order
Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim (Order)
Thu 05/10 7:47 AM
COURT MODIFIED Order On Claims Bar Date. Claims Bar Date: 06/14/2018; with BNC Service signed on 5/9/2018. (Bobis, T.) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
trustee
UST Statement of Position (paperless entry) - no objection/position
Tue 05/08 2:09 PM
Statement of Position: The U.S. Trustee has no objection to the application. filed by United States Trustee (O'Brien, Heidi) |
|
15 | 15
trustee
Statement
Tue 05/08 1:54 PM
Statement Re Status of Debtor filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc.. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Employ (Application)
Tue 05/08 12:52 PM
Amended Debtor's Application to Employ Bankruptcy Counsel filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Special Notice (Request) (paperless entry)
Fri 05/04 8:47 AM
Request for Special Notice United States Trustee, 880 Front Street, Suite 3230, San Diego, CA 92101 filed by Leslie Skorheim on behalf of United States Trustee. (Skorheim, Leslie) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Sat 05/05 9:18 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 05/05/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors
Fri 05/04 9:16 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. Notice Date 05/04/2018. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
order
Status Conference (hrg)(Order)
Thu 05/03 9:51 AM
Order Re:Status Conference on Chapter 11 Petition; with BNC Service HEARING Scheduled for 5/16/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . signed on 5/2/2018. (Slaughter, S.) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim (Motion)
Wed 05/02 12:56 PM
Debtor's Motion for Order Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim & Notice thereof filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Claim Form | ||
8 | 8
motion
Employ (Application)
Wed 05/02 12:13 PM
Debtor's Application to Employ Counsel filed by Daniel C Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. (Masters, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (BNC) (manual input)
Wed 05/02 10:08 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, and Meeting of Creditors, 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at 880 Front St., Edward J. Schwartz Bldg, 1st Fl, Room 1234 (B), San Diego, CA 92101 (Ch11) Objections for Discharge due by 7/30/2018. (Bobis, T.) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Tue 05/01 5:35 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00 by JL. Receipt Number 232650. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
plan
Plan (Chapter 11)
Tue 05/01 3:38 PM
Initial Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization filed by Daniel Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. . (Li, J.) |
|
4 | 4
plan
Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/01 3:37 PM
Disclosure Statement Describing Debtor's Joint Plan of Reorganization filed by Daniel Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. . (Li, J.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)
Tue 05/01 3:35 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Daniel Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. . (Li, J.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Filing of Petition, Schedules & Statements on Electronic Media (CSD 1004)
Tue 05/01 3:34 PM
Declaration Re: Filing of Petition, Schedules & Statements on Electronic Media filed by Daniel Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc. . (Li, J.) |
|
1 | 1
49
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (fee) internal
Tue 05/01 3:11 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 1717.00. Filed by Daniel Masters of Law Offices of Daniel C. Masters on behalf of Worthington Energy, Inc.. (Li, J.) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2018 (Li, J.) |