Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-41550

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marci B Mcivor
Case #: 2:18-ap-04199
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 02, 2018
Terminated:Jun 15, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Allen Lancaster
9331 Osprey Bay Circle
Davisburg, MI 48350
Represented By
Todd Allen Lancaster
contact info
Plaintiff
Realcomp II Ltd.
Represented By
Harvey R. Weingarden
contact info
Plaintiff
Realcomp II Ltd.
27555 Farmington Rd., Ste. 325
Farmington Hills, MI 48334
Represented By
Harvey R. Weingarden
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, June 18, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 2:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Realcomp II Ltd. Related [+]. (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, June 15, 2018
12 12 order Default Judgment Fri 06/15 10:49 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF NONDISCHARGEABILITY Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] 10
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 06/15 10:50 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:18-ap-4199 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/15 10:50 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-4199 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/14 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Realcomp II Ltd. Related [+]. (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
10 10 motion Default Judgment Thu 06/14 11:42 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Realcomp II Ltd. (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Default Judgment of Nondischargeability
Friday, June 08, 2018
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/08 9:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Todd Allen Lancaster - Default Judgment Motion due by 06/22/2018. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/17 9:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on Todd Allen Lancaster 5/3/2018 (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
7 7 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Wed 05/16 1:01 PM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Todd Allen Lancaster - Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 5/23/2018. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
6 6 order Striking Document (text) Wed 05/09 9:32 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the case caption is incorrect/incomplete Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Marci B. McIvor (lmoss)
Related: [-] Summons Service Executed5 Summons Service Executed
Monday, May 07, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 05/07 11:27 AM
Summons Service Executed on Todd Allen Lancaster 5/3/2018 (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
4 4 court Reissued Summons (auto) Thu 05/03 8:50 AM
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Thu 05/03 8:50 AM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Realcomp II Ltd.. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 05/02 11:26 AM
Summons Issued on Todd Allen Lancaster Answer Due 06/1/2018 (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/02 11:26 AM
Adversary case 18-04199 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Realcomp II Ltd., Realcomp II Ltd. against Todd Allen Lancaster. Fee Amount $350. (Weingarden, Harvey)
Related: [-]