Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10601

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:18-ap-50418
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:May 02, 2018
Terminated:Jul 26, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Weinstein Company, LLC
Represented By
The Weinstein Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lantern Entertainment LLC
Represented By
Lantern Entertainment LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amityville Horror Enterprises, LLC, Cindy Lee Stock, Noel Lutz, Gabrielle Lutz and Melissa Irwin
Represented By
Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, July 26, 2018
17 17 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Thu 07/26 2:09 PM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Queroli, David)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/26 7:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50418 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/25 10:36 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Amityville Horror Enterprises, LLC, Cindy Lee Stock, Noel Lutz, Gabrielle Lutz and Melissa Irwin. (O'Brien, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
15 15 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 07/19 10:56 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing by Konstantina Haidopoulos . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 misc Transcript Thu 07/19 8:51 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 7/18/2018 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/17/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber ,Reliable at Telephone number (302)654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/26/2018. Redaction Request Due By 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/20/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/17/2018. (BJM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 07/16 1:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/18/2018 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
12 12 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 07/03 11:57 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing by Forrest Kuffer . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 07/03 11:54 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing by Forrest Kuffer . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, June 25, 2018
10 10 misc Transcript Mon 06/25 9:57 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/22/2018 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/24/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber ,Reliable at Telephone number (302)654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/2/2018. Redaction Request Due By 7/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/26/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/24/2018. (BJM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Thu 06/21 10:35 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 06/20 2:18 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Weinstein Company Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Queroli, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
7 7 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 06/15 3:13 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing by Forrest Kuffer . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, June 01, 2018
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/01 7:08 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by The Weinstein Company, LLC Mediation due date: 10/1/2018. (Silberglied, Russell)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/01 6:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Lantern Entertainment LLC Mediation due date: 10/1/2018.(Meltzer, Evelyn)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/08 2:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Amityville Horror Enterprises, LLC, Cindy Lee Stock, Noel Lutz, Gabrielle Lutz and Melissa Irwin. (O'Brien, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
3 3 cmp Alias Summons Wed 05/02 3:04 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant The Weinstein Company, LLC and Lantern Entertainment LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 7/2/2018. (Edmonson, Jamie) Modified on 5/3/2018 (LAM)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 05/02 2:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50418 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8855889, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 05/02 2:33 PM
Adversary case 18-50418 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Amityville Horror Enterprises, LLC, Cindy Lee Stock, Noel Lutz, Gabrielle Lutz and Melissa Irwin against The Weinstein Company, LLC and Lantern Entertainment LLC. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 07/31/2018. (Edmonson, Jamie)
Related: [-]