Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp, II
Case #: 3:18-cv-01030
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 03, 2018
Terminated:Jun 06, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 30, 2018 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Duane Anderson
Represented By
Laura J. Avery
Reminger & Reminger - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Vin Devers, Inc.
Represented By
Laura J. Avery
Reminger & Reminger - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Hadleigh Keesee
Represented By
F. Benjamin Riek, III
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 06, 2019
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/06 4:01 PM
Stipulation of Order of Dismissal with Prejudice at Plaintiff's costs. Each party to bear their own attorney fees and expenses of litigation. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/6/2019. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 06/05 5:24 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Vin Devers, Inc.. (Hulme, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
17 17 order Consent to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/15 8:28 AM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of James R. Knepp, II for further proceedings.. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/15/2019. (S,AL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 03/15 8:42 AM
Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick terminated. Related document(s)17 . (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Thu 03/14 12:27 PM
Minutes of Settlement Conference [non-document] held on 3/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. Plaintiff appeared with attorney F. Benjamin Riek, III; attorney Roy A. Hulme appeared for Defendants with Paul Vin Devers and Jason Perry. Parties consent to this case being transferred to the docket of James R. Knepp, II for further proceedings. Case settled. Dismissal entry to be filed within 30 days. (Court Reporter: Stacey Kiprotich.)Time: 2.5 hours. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
16 16 notice Attorney Substitution Tue 03/12 10:11 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Laurie J. Avery and adding attorney Roy A. Hulme filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Hulme, Roy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to withdraw document Tue 11/27 8:31 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting plaintiff's motion to withdraw her amended complaint. Related [+]. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/27/2018.(S,AL)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
14 14 motion Withdraw Document Tue 11/06 4:35 PM
Motion to withdraw document Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Hadleigh Keesee. (Riek, F.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/30 2:36 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Duane Anderson, Vin Devers, Inc.. Related document(s)11 .(Avery, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Public Portal
Thursday, October 25, 2018
12 12 4 pgs order Order Thu 10/25 12:32 PM
Order Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 3/11/2019. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 10/25/2018. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/16 2:39 PM
Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Hadleigh Keesee. (Riek, F.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
10 10 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Case Referred to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Wed 10/03 10:00 AM
Order of Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2018. Plaintiff is granted leave until 10/22/2018, to file an amended complaint.The liability discovery deadline is vacated and reset for 1/31/2019. Case referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II for mediation/settlement in February or March 2019, at the convenience of Judge Knepp and the parties. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/3/2018. Time: 10 minutes (SG,D)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
9 9 motion Disclosure Fri 07/06 11:17 AM
Motion for disclosure Initial Disclosures filed by Plaintiff Hadleigh Keesee. (Riek, F.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
8 8 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Thu 06/14 9:54 AM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 6/13/2018. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 7/31/2018. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The Court will initiate the call. Plaintiff's revised settlement demand to be served by 9/17/2018; Defendants to respond by the next telephone status conference. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 6/14/2018. Time: 30 minutes(SG,D)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
7 7 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting Mon 06/11 6:05 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Hadleigh Keesee. (Riek, F.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
6 6 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Thu 05/24 2:25 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 6/13/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick.(S,AL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Friday, May 18, 2018
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/18 2:50 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Duane Anderson, Vin Devers, Inc.. (Avery, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
4 4 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 05/04 10:46 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_doc Supplement Fri 05/04 9:47 AM
Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet - Page 2, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)1 . (Avery, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/03 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Vin Devers, Inc.. (Avery, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/03 3:37 PM
Notice of Removal from Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-0201801298-000 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8687345.. Filed by Duane Anderson, Vin Devers, Inc.. (Avery, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 05/04 9:04 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/04 10:45 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
Related: [-]