Martin County, NC v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45522 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 4:18-cv-00071 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:42 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Martin County, NC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:32 PM EDT |
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4472311.), filed by Martin County, NC. (Seagle, J.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Martin County, NC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | ||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Document: Email of Text Order from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of MDL Panel regarding MDL No. 2804 advising our court of the conditional transfer order filed by the Panel and inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Document: As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/27/18. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | |
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/27/18. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. File transmitted electronically. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/3/2018.] | ||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 4:18-cv-00071. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |