Pike v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45368 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 7:17-cv-00193 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:42 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richie Enterprises, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Magna Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The County of Pike
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Terminated: 03/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:03 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 17-CI-1283. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3965987), filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - SC Process & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - SCR w/out Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - MDL 2804 Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 2015 WL 3440492, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 2017 WL 2843614, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 2017 WL 3317300, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are indirect wholly owned subsidiaries of Endo International PLC. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
CLERK'S NOTE re1 : MDL Panel notified of possible tag along case by e-mail with a copy of notice of removal & docket sheet. (cc: SKV) (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: CIVIL CASES RELATED TO COMPLAINTS FILED AGAINST AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINALHEALTH, INC., and MCKESSON CORPORATION: 1. Effective immediately, Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/2017. (TDA) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY John D. Lombardo by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Information Form | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Sean Morris by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Information Form | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Portenoy. (Westberry, R.) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Portenoy. (Bush, Bridget) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
9 | 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Russell Portenoy date by which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint(Westberry, R.) Modified text on 1/2/2018 (TDA). [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re9 MOTION to Stay by Russell Portenoy date by which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Note: states with Plaintiff County of Pikes consent). (MJY)[Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The County of Pike(Cronen, Leslie) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order granting Remand | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER: 1. Dfts Motion to Stay (R.9 ) is GRANTED ; 2. Action STAYED pending determination of removal; and 3. Parties SHALL FILE a status report nlt 60 days from date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments and updating Court on state of the removal. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/8/2018. (TDA) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for John D. Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3982975)(Benvenuti, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13 MOTION for Sean Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3983021)(Benvenuti, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Supporting Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 MOTION to Stay by McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to John D. Lombardo re12 MOTION for John D. Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3982975). (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Sean Morris re13 MOTION for Sean Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3983021). (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re12 MOTION for John D. Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3982975) (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re13 MOTION for Sean Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3983021) (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Joseph L. Ciaccio by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Information Form | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Paul B. Maslo by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Information Form | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Paul J. Napoli by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Information Form | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Salatore C. Badala by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application.(TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attorney Information Form | ||
19 | 19 ORDER: 1. Parties' Agreed Motion to Stay (R.14 ) is GRANTED ; 2. Action and all pending motions STAYED pending a determination of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; and 3. Parties SHALL FILE a status report no later than 180 days from entry of order explaining any relevant developments. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/22/2018. (TDA) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Perry M. Bentley & Monica Hobson Braun added for Cardinal Health, Inc., per DE #20. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
20 | 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
21 | 21 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Peck, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey F. Peck on behalf of Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Peck, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:15 Notice to Attorney re Joseph L. Ciaccio - nothing filed. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:16 Notice to Attorney re Paul B. Maslo - nothing filed. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:17 Notice to Attorney re Paul J. Napoli - nothing filed. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:18 Notice to Attorney re Salatore C. Badala - nothing filed. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24 MOTION for Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The County of Pike ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4020531)(Cronen, Leslie) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of S. Badala, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25 NOTICE by The County of Pike re16 Notice to Attorney,17 Notice to Attorney,15 Notice to Attorney Withdrawal of Attorneys Napoli, Ciaccio and Maslo (Cronen, Leslie) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Salvatore C. Badala re24 MOTION for Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The County of Pike ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4020531). (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re24 MOTION for Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The County of Pike ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4020531). (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:25 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorneys Napoli, Ciaccio and Maslo. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26 STATUS REPORT by The County of Pike. (Cronen, Leslie) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
27 | 27 MOTION to Clarify by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Obligation to File Status Reports(Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28 MOTION for Joinder27 MOTION to Clarify by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Obligation to File Status Reports by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. as to status (Peck, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:26 Status Report (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29 ORDER: Dfts Motions to Clarify (R.27 ; R.28 ) are GRANTED and the requirement for status reports is SUSPENDED pending the decision of the JPML. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/16/2018. (TDA) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
30 | 30 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Russell Portenoy. (Westberry, R.) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review:30 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal as to Russell Portenoy. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | ||
31 | 31 ORDER: parties being in Agreement (R.30 ) and Court being advised, it is ORDERED that claims of Pla County of Pike, against Dft Russell Portenoy, shall be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/26/2018. (TDA) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
32 | 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Stephens, Angela) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 to Northern District of Ohio. (TDA) [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
34 | 34 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to Tranfer Order filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (TDA) cc: COR & NDOH [Transferred from kyed on 4/6/2018.] | |
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 7:17-cv-00193. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |