Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10129

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 1:18-ap-01010
Case Filed:May 04, 2018
Terminated:Jun 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Young's Aircraft Sales, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Young's Aircraft Sales, LLC
contact info
Defendant
D. Matthew Edwards
733 N. Main
Sikeston, MO 63801
Represented By
D. Matthew Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Eric Icenogle
55 S. Adams
Carthage, IL 62321
Represented By
Eric Icenogle
contact info
Defendant
Sterling Bank
1100 Sterling Drive
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Sterling Bank
contact info
Defendant
The Dennis Young Revocable Trust
5100 PP Highway
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
The Dennis Young Revocable Trust
contact info
Defendant
YOUNGS WESTSIDE MOTORS, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
YOUNGS WESTSIDE MOTORS, LLC
contact info
Defendant
First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff
704 North Westwood
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff
contact info
Defendant
ServisFirst Bank
850 Shades Creek Parkway Suite 200
Birminghan, AL 35209
Represented By
ServisFirst Bank
contact info
Defendant
The Dawn Barbee Revocable Trust
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
The Dawn Barbee Revocable Trust
contact info
Defendant
Young & Worley Aircraft Sales, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Young & Worley Aircraft Sales, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Young's Carpet Gallery, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Young's Carpet Gallery, LLC
contact info
Defendant
E.L.A. Management Group, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
E.L.A. Management Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Young's General Contractors, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Young's General Contractors, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Young's General Contracting, Inc.
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Young's General Contracting, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
B&N Leasing, LLC
1710 West Harper
Poplar Bluff, MO 63902
Represented By
B&N Leasing, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Harding
410 Ridgeview Drive
Piedmont, MO 63957
Represented By
Joshua Harding
contact info
Defendant
Dennis J. Young
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Dennis J. Young
contact info
Defendant
Diamond H. Ranch, LLC
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Diamond H. Ranch, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Harding Enterprises, LLC
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Harding Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Andrea Dawn Harding
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Andrea Dawn Harding
contact info
Defendant
Greggory Allen Harding
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Greggory Allen Harding
contact info
Plaintiff
The Hanover Insurance Company
4520 Main Street Suite 1600
Kansas City, MO 64111
Represented By
Michael M. Tamburini
Levy Craig
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Saturday, June 22, 2019
144 144 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/22 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 06/22/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 141
Thursday, June 20, 2019
143 143 notice Notice (Generic) Thu 06/20 4:24 PM
Amended Notice and Certificate of Service: Filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company Related [+]. (Leiker, Jason)
Related: [-] 141 Judgment (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company, Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company).
142 142 notice Notice (Generic) Thu 06/20 11:04 AM
Notice and Certificate of Service: Filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company Related [+]. (Tamburini, Michael)
Related: [-] 141 Judgment (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company, Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company).
141 141 order Judgment Thu 06/20 10:08 AM
Judgment Related [+]. (pas, s)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant The Hanover Insurance Company, Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/20 10:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1010 Closed (pas, s)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
140 140 notice Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/19 2:44 PM
Joint Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company. (Leiker, Jason)
Related: [-]