Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10129

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 1:18-ap-01011
Case Filed:May 04, 2018
Dismissed:May 07, 2018
Terminated:May 07, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Youngs Aircraft Sales, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Youngs Aircraft Sales, LLC
contact info
Defendant
D. Matthew Edwards
733 N. Main
Sikeston, MO 63801
Represented By
D. Matthew Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Eric Icenogle
55 S. Adams
Carthage, IL 62321
Represented By
Eric Icenogle
contact info
Defendant
Sterling Bank
1100 Sterling Drive
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Sterling Bank
contact info
Defendant
The Dennis Young Revocable Trust
5100 PP Highway
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
The Dennis Young Revocable Trust
contact info
Defendant
YOUNGS WESTSIDE MOTORS, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
YOUNGS WESTSIDE MOTORS, LLC
contact info
Defendant
First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff
Garnishments 704 N. Westwood Blvd.
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff
contact info
Defendant
ServisFirst Bank
850 Shades Creek Parkway Suite 200
Birminghan, AL 35209
Represented By
ServisFirst Bank
contact info
Defendant
The Dawn Barbee Revocable Trust
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
The Dawn Barbee Revocable Trust
contact info
Defendant
Young & Worley Aircraft Sales, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Young & Worley Aircraft Sales, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Youngs Carpet Gallery, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Youngs Carpet Gallery, LLC
contact info
Defendant
E.L.A. Management Group, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
E.L.A. Management Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Youngs General Contractors, LLC
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Youngs General Contractors, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Youngs General Contracting, Inc.
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Youngs General Contracting, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
B&N Leasing, LLC
1710 West Harper
Poplar Bluff, MO 63902
Represented By
B&N Leasing, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Harding
410 Ridgeview Drive
Piedmont, MO 63957
Represented By
Joshua Harding
contact info
Defendant
Dennis J. Young
5100 Highway PP
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Dennis J. Young
contact info
Defendant
Diamond H. Ranch, LLC
Represented By
Diamond H. Ranch, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Harding Enterprises, LLC
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Harding Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Andrea Dawn Harding
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Andrea Dawn Harding
contact info
Defendant
Greggory Allen Harding
2312 Orr Road
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901
Represented By
Greggory Allen Harding
contact info
Plaintiff
The Hanover Insurance Company
4520 Main Street Suite 1600
Kansas City, MO 64111
Represented By
Michael M. Tamburini
Levy Craig
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Friday, May 11, 2018
6 6 crditcrd none Fri 05/11 3:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-01011 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 14986017, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, May 10, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/10 12:18 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding, Judgment, and Order Concerning Adversary Caption Filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company Related [+]. (pri, m)
Related: [-] 3 Order Dismissing AP Case,4 Judgment
Monday, May 07, 2018
4 4 order Judgment Mon 05/07 4:16 PM
Judgment Related [+]. (bai, j)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company
3 3 order Dismissing Case - AP Mon 05/07 4:14 PM
Order Dismissing Case . (bai, j)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee Through Internet Mon 05/07 8:12 AM
Order and Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee Through Internet. Related [+]. Filing Fee due by 5/9/2018. (ber, d)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Hanover Insurance Company
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 05/07 4:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary 1:18-ap-1011 (bai, j)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/07 4:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1011 Closed (bai, j)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/04 6:37 PM
Adversary case 18-01011 Complaint by The Hanover Insurance Company (attorney Michael M. Tamburini ) against Greggory Allen Harding, Andrea Dawn Harding, Harding Enterprises, LLC, Diamond H. Ranch, LLC, Dennis J. Young, Joshua Harding, B&N Leasing, LLC, Youngs General Contracting, Inc., Youngs General Contractors, LLC, Youngs Aircraft Sales, LLC, E.L.A. Management Group, LLC, Youngs Carpet Gallery, LLC, Young & Worley Aircraft Sales, LLC, The Dawn Barbee Revocable Trust, ServisFirst Bank, First Midwest Bank of Poplar Bluff, YOUNGS WESTSIDE MOTORS, LLC, The Dennis Young Revocable Trust, Sterling Bank, Eric Icenogle, D. Matthew Edwards Fee Amount $350.(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(72 (Injunctive relief - other))(Tamburini, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Civil Cover