George W. Giles v. Dex Media, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Carol Mirando |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00321 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 03, 2018 6:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dex Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George W. Giles
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Charles N. Schwartz
Terminated: 06/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James R. Volkert
Terminated: 06/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark no number
Mon 08/27 10:10 AM
CASE electronically transferred to the Northern District of Florida, Pensacola Division.(laf) |
||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on motion to transfer case
Fri 08/24 11:55 AM
ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff Georgia W. Giles' Second Consented Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER the above captioned case to the Northern District of Florida, Pensacola Division. The Clerk shall terminate any deadlines, transfer any pending motions, and close the Fort Myers file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/24/2018. (LMF) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Transfer case
Tue 08/21 8:26 PM
Consent MOTION to transfer case (Second) by George W. Giles. (Mattox, Marie) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Case management and scheduling order
Mon 08/20 4:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Trial term commencing 10/1/2019 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/20/2018. (SJB) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on motion to transfer case
Fri 08/10 4:12 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Plaintiff Georgia W. Giles' Consented Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/10/2018. (LMF) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Preliminary pretrial conference
Wed 08/08 5:59 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2018. (Digital) (SJB) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Transfer case
Tue 08/07 10:29 PM
Consent MOTION to transfer case to the Northern District of Florida by George W. Giles. (Mattox, Marie) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 08/06 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Fernee Kelly on behalf of George W. Giles, Charles N. Schwartz, James R. Volkert (Kelly, Charlotte) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Case Management Report
Fri 08/03 4:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pena, Kelly) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 08/03 11:26 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Unopposed Omnibus Motion for Three-Day Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report and to appear Telephonically at Conference and Hearing. The parties shall have up to and including August 3, 2018 to file a Case Management Report. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. The parties are advised, however, that they should file motions requesting to appear telephonically with sufficient time to allow the Court to rule on the motion prior to the scheduled appearance. ALL parties must appear telephonically for the Preliminary Pretrial Hearing scheduled for August 8, 2018 at 10:30 am. The toll free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 3535845. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 18321. ALL parties are to appear by landline and not a cellular phone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/3/2018. (SJB) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File
Tue 07/31 5:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Unopposed Omnibus Motion for Three-Day Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report and to Appear Telephonically at Conference and Hearing by Dex Media, Inc.. (Pena, Kelly) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 06/22 12:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Dex Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dex Media Holdings, Inc. for Dex Media, Inc... (Tricarico, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of hearing
Wed 06/20 10:01 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 08/8/2018 at 10:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. Pursuant to the Court's Related Case Order and Track Two Notice [Doc. 4] and Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the parties have up to and including July 31, 2018 to file their Case Management Report. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed (3) three business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration. (SJB) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order on motion for extension of time to answer
Thu 06/07 1:47 PM
ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Four-Day Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 6/7/2018. (LPB) |
|
10 | 10
order
Interested persons order
Thu 06/07 10:54 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Dex Media, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/21/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/7/2018. (drn) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Thu 06/07 9:53 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 6 Amended Complaint by Dex Media, Inc..(Tricarico, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/06 1:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint by Dex Media, Inc.. (Tricarico, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 05/22 9:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Charles N. Schwartz, James R. Volkert. (Mattox, Marie) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/21 10:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dex Media, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by George W. Giles.(Mattox, Marie) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Interested persons order
Mon 05/14 10:25 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/29/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/14/2018. (SJB) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Mon 05/14 10:24 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/14/2018. (SJB) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Wed 05/09 8:36 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/9/2018. (drn) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
*Order pdf
Wed 05/09 8:35 AM
OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff George Giles' claims are SEVERED from the present action. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to assign a new case number for Plaintiff George Giles' separate action. The new separate action shall be assigned to the Undersigned and United States Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open the new case with the Complaint (Doc. 1-2) from this case, and to docket this Opinion and Order with the new case file. Plaintiff Giles is DIRECTED to file an amended complaint to appropriately plead his case as a single plaintiff on or before May 21, 2018 using the new case number. Plaintiffs Charles Schwartz and James Volkert are DIRECTED to file an amended complaint to appropriately plead their case on or before May 21, 2018. Defendant Dex Media shall file an answer to the amended complaints on or before June 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/7/2018.(drn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/09 8:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Dex Media, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Charles N. Schwartz, James R. Volkert, George W. Giles.(drn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |