Morgan v. City University of New York (CUNY) et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Lois Bloom |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02714 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 30, 2018 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
CUNY Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City University of New York (CUNY)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
President Rudolph Crew
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Asst. Director Jerry Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Slyvia Kinard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chancellor James Milliken
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Victor Stevens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ras Omeil Novado Morgan
956 East 84th Street Floor Basement
Brooklyn, NY 11236 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 11/05 9:05 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. It is ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed effective October 16, 2020 for failure of Appellant to file the brief and any required appendix by that date. No extension of time to file will be granted. Issued as Mandate: 11/5/20. USCA #20-628. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 07/28 10:37 AM
ORDER of USCA as to40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. Appellant, pro se, moves the Court to recall the mandate and reinstate this appeal which was dismissed on a fee default. The motion is unopposed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Within 14 days of the date ofthis order, Appellant must file a scheduling notification proposing a filing date for the opening brief. Certified Copy Issued: 7/28/20. USCA #20-628. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/08 3:35 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed effective June 10, 2020 for failure of Appellant to either pay the filing fee in full or move for IFP by that date. Issued as Mandate; 7/8/20. USCA #20-628 (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Tue 07/07 4:12 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 4653150697 re40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
appeal
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
Tue 07/07 4:15 PM
First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals42 Receipt for payment of Notice of Appeal. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
||
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/09 5:38 PM
ORDER denying41 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 1/9/2020. (Kuntz, William) |
||
appeal
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
Thu 01/09 6:04 PM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.40 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
||
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/09 4:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
40 | 40
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 01/09 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to38 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,39 Clerk's Judgment by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. No fee paid. IFP pending. Service done electronically. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 12/18 4:26 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in its entirety. Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 12/18/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 12/17 2:10 PM
DECISION and ORDER: Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED in their entirety. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motions at ECF Nos.32 and35 and close the case. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/13/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
respoth
Reply in Support
Fri 05/03 1:01 PM
REPLY in Support re35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph L. Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken. (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter Identifying Each Document in Bundled Courtesy Copy | ||
36 | 36
28
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 05/03 11:48 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Served by Plaintiff pro-se Ras OMeil NOVado MORgan filed by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph L. Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken. (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 27 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 05/03 11:29 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph L. Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken. (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter with Local Rule 7.2 Notice, dated 1/25/2019, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Affirmation of Service dated 1/25/2019 | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
respoth
Reply in Support
Wed 04/24 1:11 PM
REPLY in Support re32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Slyvia Kinard. (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter Identifying Each Document in Bundled Courtesy Copy, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
33 | 33
27
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Wed 04/24 1:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Served by Plaintiff pro-se Ras OMeil NOVado MORgan filed by Slyvia Kinard. (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 27 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 04/24 12:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Slyvia Kinard. (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Local Rule 7.2 Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Local Rule 12.1 Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Joseph E. Macy, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 3, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 4, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 5, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 6, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 7, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 8, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 9, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 10, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 11, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 12, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 13, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 14, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 15, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 16, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 17, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 18, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 19, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 20, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 21, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Compl. Ex. 22, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Compl. Ex. | ||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/21 4:00 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to brief the remainder of their submissions as follows: (1) Plaintiff to serve its opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before April 19, 2019 at 5:00 P.M.; and (2) Defendants to serve their Reply, if any, on or before May 3, 2019 at 5:00 P.M. on ECF. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/20/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Wed 02/20 11:51 AM
Letter requesting scheduling clarification by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken, Victor Stevens (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/19 5:52 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/19/2019. (Kuntz, William) |
||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/19 2:22 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Fri 01/25 11:53 AM
Letter Regarding Service of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken, Victor Stevens (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Fri 01/25 9:35 AM
Letter Regarding Service of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Slyvia Kinard (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 10/10 4:03 PM
Letter in Response to Docket Entry 25 - Letter from Plaintiff pro-se requesting Adjournment of Pre-Motion Conference by Slyvia Kinard (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 10/10 7:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pre Motion Hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6H North before Judge William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/10/2018. (Niles, Elizabeth) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Tue 10/09 12:04 PM
Letter dated 10/4/2018 to Judge Kuntz from Ras Omeil Morgan requesting the Pre-Motion conference be scheduled for the second week of November to grant leave for Plaintiff to file an opposition to Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Thu 10/04 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re22 MOTION for pre motion conference on proposed Motion to Dismiss by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken, Victor Stevens (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 10/04 12:35 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Slyvia Kinard. (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
22 | 22
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 10/04 12:01 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference on proposed Motion to Dismiss by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph Crew, Jerry Hoffman, James Milliken. (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Thu 10/04 4:23 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6H North before Judge William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/4/2018. (Niles, Elizabeth) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Thu 10/04 4:25 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6H North before Judge William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/4/2018. (Niles, Elizabeth) |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order(Other)
Wed 09/12 11:56 AM
ORDER re17 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Slyvia Kinard. Application granted. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/10/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order(Other)
Wed 09/12 11:43 AM
ORDER re19 Notice of Consent to Change Attorney filed by Slyvia Kinard. Application granted. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/10/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Mon 09/10 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Daniel James Evers (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/10 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Evers on behalf of Slyvia Kinard (aty to be noticed) (Evers, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Mon 09/10 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Joseph E. Macy (Macy, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/10 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Slyvia Kinard (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/06 10:25 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph Crew, Jerry Hoffman, Slyvia Kinard, James Milliken, Victor Stevens. (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/06 2:25 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/6/2018. (Niles, Elizabeth) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 07/02 10:44 AM
ORDER: Defendants' counsel writes to request a 45-day extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendants'13 request is granted. Plaintiff is reminded that he, too, may need to request an extension of time to respond in the future. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by 8/20/2018. SO ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/29/2018. C/mailed. (Defendants' answers due by 8/20/2018.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/28 3:14 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by CUNY Board of Trustees, City University of New York (CUNY), Rudolph Crew, Jerry Hoffman, Slyvia Kinard, James Milliken, Victor Stevens. (Saffir, Jaclyn) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 06/25 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Victor Stevens . See Remarks on USM-285 Form: "Endeavor: No Longer at this Location per Legal, 3rd Floor." (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of pro se Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. Lieutenant Jerry Hoffman , Assistant - Director served on 6/13/2018, answer due 7/4/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 3:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of pro se Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. Slyvia Kinard , Chief Diversity Officer of Medgar Evers College of CUNY served on 6/13/2018, answer due 7/4/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of pro se Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. Rudolph Crew , President of Medgar Evers College of CUNY served on 6/13/2018, answer due 7/4/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of pro se Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. James Milliken , Chancellor of CUNY served on 6/15/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of pro se Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. CUNY Board of Trustees served on 6/15/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of pro se Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. City University of New York (CUNY) served on 6/15/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/16 1:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to City University of New York (CUNY); CUNY Board of Trustees; James Milliken, Chancellor of CUNY; Rudolph Crew, President of Medgar Evers College of CUNY; Slyvia Kinard, Chief Diversity Officer of Medgar Evers College; Lieutenant Jerry Hoffman, Assistant-Director; Victor Stevens, Director. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/15 5:07 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's2 application to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 is granted. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon the named defendants without prepayment of fees. The parties shall advise the Court by signing the enclosed form whether they jointly consent to trial and decision on this case by me, a United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/14/2018. C/mailed w/Attachments: # 1 Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, # 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge Trial. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 05/09 12:11 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ras Omeil Novado Morgan. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |