Harrison County Board of Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45547 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 2:18-cv-00359 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:45 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harrison County Board of Commissioners
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Terminated: 04/17/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:04 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harrison County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number CVH 2018 0024 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6409726), filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Service Papers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc, Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
3 | 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants originally filed in Harrison County Court of Common Pleas on 3/20/2018 by Harrison County Board of Commissioners. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/23/2018. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 6/27/2018. by Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Tarney, Tyler) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7 ORDER Granting6 Dfts' Perry Fine, M.D., Scott Fishman, M.D., and Lynn Webster, M.D.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due within 60 days following the final determination of removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/27/2018. (sln) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sct) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | ||
8 | 8 Certified copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER re MDL2804. (sct) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00359. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |