Greenwood Leflore Hospital v. McKesson Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45551 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 4:18-cv-00091 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:45 PM EST |
Defendant
John Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Greenwood Leflore Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:28 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 5/9/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 66 pgs COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300021812, filed by Greenwood Leflore Hospital. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 5/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-00091. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |