UPF Innovations, LLC v. Synopsys, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00199 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 06, 2018 2:40 AM CST |
Defendant
Synopsys, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
David Folsom
dfolsom@jw.com Jackson Walker, LLP 6002-B Summerfield Drive
Texarkana, TX 75503 |
|
Plaintiff
UPF Innovations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 01/14 12:26 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) |
|
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 01/14 12:24 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion to Dismiss. Synopsys, is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2019. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Dismiss
Fri 01/11 4:38 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by UPF Innovations, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 12/20 9:34 AM
ORDER granting35 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/19/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Stay
Tue 12/18 8:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by UPF Innovations, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/07 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Kesack on behalf of UPF Innovations, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7015759. (Kesack, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/06 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David C Radulescu on behalf of UPF Innovations, LLC (Radulescu, David) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/06 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Etai Lahav on behalf of UPF Innovations, LLC (Lahav, Etai) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Mon 11/05 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Synopsys, Inc. - Notice of Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production (Jensen, Travis) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Thu 10/11 10:55 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting27 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/11/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Wed 10/10 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Synopsys, Inc. re Initial and Additional Disclosures (Jensen, Travis) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Wed 10/10 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UPF Innovations, LLC re Initial and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Protective Order
Mon 10/08 4:33 PM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by UPF Innovations, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 10/04 1:44 PM
AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting25 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/4/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 10/02 3:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Synopsys, Inc..(Jones, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Docket Control Order | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/27 9:59 AM
AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER granting22 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2018. (ch, ) |
|
23 | 23
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/27 9:54 AM
ORDER granting21 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2018. (ch, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 09/27 9:58 AM
JOINT DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2019., Mediation Completion due by 5/21/2019., Markman Hearing set for 4/23/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 9/16/2019., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2019. Jury Selection set for 11/4/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/25 1:47 PM
Agreed MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Discovery Order by UPF Innovations, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreed E-Discovery Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/25 1:45 PM
Agreed MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order by UPF Innovations, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediator
Fri 09/14 12:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hon. David Folsom, Jackson Walker, L.L.P., 6002 Summerfield Drive, Suite B, Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number 903- 255-3251, fax number 903-255-3266, and email dfolsom@jw.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/14/18. (ch, ) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Designation of Mediator
Thu 09/13 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge David Folsom, filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Joint Notice of Agreed Mediator (Jones, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 09/12 9:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2018. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml) |
||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 09/10 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Synopsys, Inc. (Jones, Michael) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 09/06 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/11/2018 01:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that the TIME for the hearing has changed.***(jml) |
||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Tue 08/28 8:21 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UPF Innovations, LLC re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/08 4:41 PM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/8/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
Wed 07/18 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by UPF Innovations, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/16 4:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Synopsys, Inc. (Jensen, Travis) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/16 4:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Synopsys, Inc..(Jensen, Travis) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/16 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared B Bobrow on behalf of Synopsys, Inc. (Bobrow, Jared) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/16 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Jensen on behalf of Synopsys, Inc. (Jensen, Travis) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/16 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of Synopsys, Inc. (Frost, Claudia) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Mon 07/16 4:46 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 05/23 1:32 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Synopsys, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
8 | 8
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 05/23 11:55 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Synopsys, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 05/23 12:00 PM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Synopsys, Inc. to 7/1/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 05/23 1:52 PM
Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Synopsys, Inc. to 7/16/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/14 9:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/14/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/11 12:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by UPF Innovations, LLC. Synopsys, Inc. served on 5/11/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/10 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Synopsys, Inc.. (ch, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 05/10 3:02 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 05/10 3:01 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UPF Innovations, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/10 3:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UPF Innovations, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/10 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Synopsys, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6772206.), filed by UPF Innovations, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - '188 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 05/10 3:25 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Thu 05/10 3:25 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |