Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc., et al v. George Ian Boxill, et al
Original Case: 0:17-cv-01212
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-01896 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday May 11, 2018 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
George Ian Boxill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Rogue Music Alliance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Deliverance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Prince Rogers Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2018 3:35 AM CDT |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [4655173] 18-1896 (JMM) | ||
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, order filed 04/24/18, and docket entries. [4655175] 18-1896 (JMM) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 06/05/2018. Appendix due 06/15/2018. BRIEF APPELLANT, George Ian Boxill, Deliverance, LLC and Rogue Music Alliance, LLC due 06/15/2018 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4655176] 18-1896 (JMM) |
||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Douglas L. Mahaffey for Appellants George Ian Boxill, Deliverance, LLC and Rogue Music Alliance, LLC w/service 04/26/2018 [4655182] 18-1896 (DM) | ||
19 pgs MOTION for temporary stay, filed by Mr. Paul Allen Godfread for Appellants George Ian Boxill, Rogue Music Alliance, LLC and Deliverance, LLC, Ms. Candace Kwon for Appellants George Ian Boxill, Rogue Music Alliance, LLC and Deliverance, LLC, Doug Mahaffey for Appellants George Ian Boxill, Rogue Music Alliance, LLC and Deliverance, LLC, Mr. Douglas W. Perlman for Appellants George Ian Boxill, Rogue Music Alliance, LLC and Deliverance, LLC and Mr. Farzad Rastegar for Appellants George Ian Boxill, Rogue Music Alliance, LLC and Deliverance, LLC w/service 04/26/2018. [4655192] 18-1896 (JPP) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Joseph J. Cassioppi for Appellees Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. and Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc. w/service 04/26/2018 [4655197] 18-1896 (JJC) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Grant D. Fairbairn for Appellees Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. and Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc. w/service 04/26/2018 [4655198] 18-1896 (JJC) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Lora M. Friedemann for Appellees Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. and Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc. w/service 04/26/2018 [4655199] 18-1896 (JJC) | ||
4 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of Order dated 04/26/2018 entitled Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Enjoin Arbitration Proceedings Pending Appeal [4655492] 18-1896 (CYZ) |