23andMe, Inc. v. Ancestry.com DNA, LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Referred: | Robert M Illman |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-02791 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 07, 2018 1:15 AM PST |
Defendant
Ancestry.com DNA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ancestry.com LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ancestry.com Operations Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
23andMe, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
132 | 132
![]() REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
131 | 131
![]() Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 130 Stipulation of Dismissal.(afmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
130 | 130
![]() STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by 23andMe, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) |