Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Walter H Rice
Case #: 3:18-cv-00162
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 11, 2018
Terminated:Aug 28, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 07, 2018 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Pamela Thorpe
231 New Haven Drive
Urbana, OH 43078
Defendant
Your Home Apartment Rentals
113 S. Main Street
Urbana, OH 43078
Plaintiff
Mary Duvall
113 S. Main Street
Urbana, OH 43078
Represented By
Carrie J. Dyer
Mansell Law LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 27, 2018
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 08/28 7:25 AM
COURT'S ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY DEFENDANT, PAMELA THORPE, AND THE AUTOMATIC STAY OF THIS COURT'S PROCEEDINGS THAT OCCURS AS A RESULT; CASE STAYEDAND ADMINISTRATIVELY PROCESSED; REQUEST OF DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/27/2018. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 08/21 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Conference held on 8/21/2018. Defendant did not call in for conference. Due to the filing of document9 , no dates were set at this time. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/20 4:03 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Pamela Thorpe of Bankruptcy Filing (McQuiston, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 08/10 3:42 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff Mary Duvall. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/16 2:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Pamela Thorpe, and Your Home Apartment Rentals. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/12 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie J. Dyer for Plaintiff Mary Duvall (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/12 9:43 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Pamela Thorpe answer due 8/2/2018; Your Home Apartment Rentals answer due 8/2/2018. (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/11 2:32 PM
NOTATION ORDER sustaining5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to defendant Pamela Thorpe only. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/11/2018. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 07/09 2:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. New date requested 8/2/2018. by Defendant Pamela Thorpe. (kma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, June 14, 2018
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/14 5:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/14 5:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Corrective Docket Entry Thu 06/14 8:31 AM
Notice of Correction re:2 Waiver of Service Executed: Counsel is instructed to file a separate waiver of service for each Defendant in the case. The document counsel has filed is one waiver for both Defendants. (kma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/13 3:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Pamela Thorpe on 5/14/2018, answer due 7/13/2018; Your Home Apartment Rentals on 5/14/2018, answer due 7/13/2018. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
misc Docket Annotation Mon 05/14 9:11 AM
Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (kma)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/11 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Pamela Thorpe, Your Home Apartment Rentals ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6440027), filed by Mary Duvall. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet