Choice Bank, LTD v. Bancredito International Bank Corporation
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01288 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 07, 2018 5:13 AM AST |
Counter Claimant
Bancredito International Bank Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Choice Bank, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bancredito International Bank Corporation
250 Munoz Rivera 14th Floor, Suite 1410
San Juan, PR 00918 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Choice Financial International, LLC
Citi Tower, 252 Ponce de Leon Floor 20
San Juan, PR 00918 |
|
Interpleader
Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Choice Financial International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Cedric D. Flowers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cedric D. Flowers
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Choice Bank, LTD
Terminated: 07/19/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
86 | 86
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 12/28 2:20 PM
ORDER noted85 Informative Motion. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/28/2018. (nat) |
|
85 | 85
motion
Informative Motion
Fri 12/28 1:38 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding receipt of funds filed by Jason R. Aguilo-Suro on behalf of Cedric D. Flowers Responses due by 1/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aguilo-Suro, Jason) |