Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth K Dillon
Referred: Robert S Ballou
Case #: 7:18-cv-00208
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 11, 2018
Re-opened:Jun 07, 2018
Terminated:Aug 15, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/15 1:27 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice (Order mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/15/2018. (tvt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Respond Thu 07/19 4:03 PM
Order to Respond with amended complaint Related [+]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/19/2018. (slt)
Related: [-] sponses due by 8/6/2018
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 07/18 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Daniel Murphy. Clerk updating docket sheet to reflect new address of Amherst County Adult Detention Center P.O. Box 1150 Madison Heights, VA 24572. (ck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
9 9 misc Inmate Account Report Thu 06/21 11:52 AM
Inmate Account Report (Incomplete) by Joshua Daniel Murphy(slt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Thursday, June 07, 2018
8 8 2 pgs order Order Reopening Case Thu 06/07 3:34 PM
ORDER REOPENING CASE. Order dismissing this case6 is vacated and Murphy has thirty days to comply with court order4 regarding the required inmate account information. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/7/2018. (slt)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 06/07 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Daniel Murphy. Clerk updating docket sheet to reflect new address of CCADC PO Box 770 Rustburg, VA 24588. (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/04 9:24 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Order and/or Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/4/2018. (slt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
5 5 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/01 2:45 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable:4 Order conditionally filing case. (No forwarding address given.) (ck)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
4 4 5 pgs order Order Prisoner Condfil Fri 05/11 3:29 PM
Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Related [+]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/11/2018. (slt)
Related: [-] sponses due by 6/4/2018
3 3 misc Inmate Account Report Fri 05/11 12:36 PM
Inmate Account Report (Incomplete) by Joshua Daniel Murphy (slt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Assets Fri 05/11 12:36 PM
Statement of Assets by Joshua Daniel Murphy (slt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/11 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §1983 against All Defendants, filed by Joshua Daniel Murphy.(slt)
Related: [-]