California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Kendall J Newman
Case #: 2:18-cv-01176
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 10, 2018
Terminated:Apr 29, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 06, 2018 12:38 AM PST
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
Represented By
Ashleigh Angeletti
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Ryan T. Hansen
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Christopher Munro Young
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Defendant
Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC
Represented By
Ashleigh Angeletti
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Ryan T. Hansen
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Christopher Munro Young
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Plaintiff
Leland Rex Hertel
Represented By
Michael Thomas Fraser
The Fraser Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Gillian Leigh Wade
Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2018
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/19/18. (Benson, A.)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 29, 2019
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/29 10:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to18 Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice. CASE CLOSED.(Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 04/26 3:55 PM
STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) by Leland Rex Hertel. (Avila, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/27 5:23 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sara Dawn Avila on behalf of Leland Rex Hertel. Attorney Avila, Sara Dawn added. (Avila, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
16 16 order Protective Order Tue 11/20 9:15 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/19/18. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
15 15 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/16 1:02 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stipulated Protective Order by Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC.(Young, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 06, 2018
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 08/06 6:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Leland Rex Hertel. (Wade, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/14 3:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC. (Young, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/14 3:16 PM
ANSWER by Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC.(Young, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/14 3:12 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ashleigh Angeletti on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC. Attorney Angeletti, Ashleigh added. (Angeletti, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/14 3:09 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ryan T. Hansen on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC. Attorney Hansen, Ryan T. added. (Hansen, Ryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/14 2:56 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher Munro Young on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC. Attorney Young, Christopher Munro added. (Young, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/30 2:56 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC served on 5/29/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. (Fraser, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/30 2:55 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Chattem, Inc. served on 5/24/2018, answer due 6/14/2018. (Fraser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/15 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Leland Rex Hertel re1 Complaint,.(Fraser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FDA Color Additive Letter
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/15 9:04 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Thomas Fraser on behalf of Leland Rex Hertel. Attorney Fraser, Michael Thomas added. (Fraser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for MCE Fri 05/11 8:36 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Fri 05/11 8:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gillian Leigh Wade* *Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade, LLP* *10250 Constellation Blvd., Fl 14* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Leland Rex Hertel (Wade, Gillian)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Chattem, Inc., Focus Consumer Healthcare, LLC by Leland Rex Hertel. Attorney Wade, Gillian Leigh added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7654277)(Wade, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael T. Fraser