St. Louis County, Minnesota v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45430 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:18-cv-00875 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:46 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse # 45
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dakota Drug, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Does
|
|
Plaintiff
St. Louis County, Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:04 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, Minnesota, case number 69DU-CV-18-623 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6034292) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. No summons requested. (Sugisaka, Keiko) Modified text on 3/28/2018 (MMP). [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Endo Health Solutions Inc. are indirect wholly owned subsidiaries of Endo International plc, a publicly held company that is not a party to this action. As of this date, there are no entities that own 10% or more of Endo International plcs stock. (Sugisaka, Keiko) Modified text on 3/29/2018 (LPH). [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
3 | 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-875 (DWF/LIB). (MMP) [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Linda Singer, Ingo W. Sprie, Jr., Sean Morris, Mark S. Cheffo, Hayden A. Coleman, Steven A. Reed, Brian M. Ercole, Charles C. Lifland as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Jointly Signed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and St. Louis County. (Sugisaka, Keiko) Modified text on 4/6/2018 (lmb). [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
6 | 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 Stipulation,,. (Sugisaka, Keiko) [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Patrick J. Fitzgerald, R. Ryan Stoll as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER on5 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/9/2018. (VLM) [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-20), transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 4/13/2018.] | |
10 | 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:18-cv-00875. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |