Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45432 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:47 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Prescription Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceutical Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HBC Service Company
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Local Union No. 120 Pipe Fitters Insurance Fund
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
Terminated: 07/24/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:17 PM EDT |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 30+ pgs Complaint with jury demand for Violation of Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8655173. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 17-md-02804 . Filed by Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120 Insurance Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund. (Faulkner, George) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund. (Faulkner, George) | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120 Insurance Fund. (Faulkner, George) |