Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-41550

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marci B Mcivor
Case #: 2:18-ap-04211
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 12, 2018
Terminated:Jun 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Allen Lancaster
9331 Osprey Bay Circle
Davisburg, MI 48350
Represented By
Todd Allen Lancaster
contact info
Plaintiff
Giffin, Inc.
Represented By
Marc M. Bakst
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 1:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc. Related [+]. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-] 14 Garnishment Release
14 14 misc Garnishment Release Tue 04/15 10:47 AM
Garnishment Release (Al-H., S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 12:28 PM
Certificate of Service re Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc. Related [+]. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-] 12 Satisfaction of Judgment
12 12 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 04/14 12:25 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc.. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
11 11 misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 10/03 2:17 PM
Request and Writ For Garnishment (Periodic) Directed To: Ulliance, Inc. (ckata)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc. Related [+]. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default,7 Motion for Default Judgment ,9 Amended Order
9 9 order Amended Order Mon 06/18 10:23 AM
CORRECTED DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Against Todd Allen Lancaster) Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] No.7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc.,8 Default Judgment
8 8 order Default Judgment Mon 06/18 9:14 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 7
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 06/18 9:17 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:18-ap-4211 : Granted by Default Judgment. (nlt)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/18 9:19 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-4211 Closed. (nlt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
7 7 motion Default Judgment Fri 06/15 1:21 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Default Judgment
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/15 8:38 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Todd Allen Lancaster - Default Judgment Motion due by 06/29/2018. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 05/14 12:02 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc. Related [+]. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Deficiency Notice
4 4 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 05/14 11:31 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 5/21/2018. (kcm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Giffin, Inc.
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 05/14 9:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on Giffin, Inc. 5/14/2018 (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 12, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Sat 05/12 10:43 AM
Summons Issued on Todd Allen Lancaster Answer Due 06/11/2018 (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 05/12 10:43 AM
Adversary case 18-04211 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Giffin, Inc. against Todd Allen Lancaster. Fee Amount $350. (Bakst, Marc)
Related: [-]