Original Case: 1:15-cv-01857

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-01204
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:May 11, 2018
Terminated:May 03, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 06, 2019 2:27 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
THE SPECTRANETICS CORPORATION
Represented By
Carrie M. Stickel
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Frederick James Baumann
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Eric Thomas Werlinger
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Richard H. Zelichov
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Michael James Lohnes
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Alex C. Myers
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT DRAKE
Represented By
Carrie M. Stickel
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Frederick James Baumann
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Eric Thomas Werlinger
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Richard H. Zelichov
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Michael James Lohnes
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Alex C. Myers
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GUY A. CHILDS
Represented By
Carrie M. Stickel
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Frederick James Baumann
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Eric Thomas Werlinger
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Richard H. Zelichov
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Michael James Lohnes
Katten Muchin Rosenman
contact info
Alex C. Myers
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL ELLIS, Individually and on Behalf of All Other Similarly Situated
Represented By
Rusty Glenn
Shuman Law Firm
contact info
Kara Wolke
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
Kip Brian Shuman
Shuman Law Firm
contact info
Robert Vincent Prongray
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
Plaintiff
PETER TUCKER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Kara Wolke
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
Robert Vincent Prongray
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALLEN J. WIESENFELD, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Robert K. Gruber
Robert K. Gruber, Attorney at Law
contact info
Kara Wolke
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
Kip Brian Shuman
Shuman Law Firm
contact info
Robert V. Prongay
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
Jennifer Leinbach
Glancy Prongay & Murray
contact info
David C. Katz
WeissLaw
contact info
Joshua M. Rubin
WeissLaw
contact info

GPO May 03 2019
[10646212] Joint stipulation to dismiss appeal is granted; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished;. Judges Tymkovich, Bacharach and Moritz. [18-1204]

Docket last updated: 05/06/2019 2:27 AM MDT
Friday, May 11, 2018
[10558480] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/11/2018. Docketing statement due 05/25/2018 for Allen J. Wiesenfeld. Transcript order form due 05/25/2018 for Allen J. Wiesenfeld. Notice of appearance due on 05/25/2018 for Guy A. Childs, Scott Drake, The Spectranetics Corporation, and Allen J. Wiesenfeld. 18-1204
Related: [-]
Att: 1 44 pgs Prelim ROA
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil