Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-41550

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marci B Mcivor
Case #: 2:18-ap-04216
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 14, 2018
Terminated:Jul 02, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Allen Lancaster
9331 Osprey Bay Circle
Davisburg, MI 48350
Represented By
Todd Allen Lancaster
contact info
Plaintiff
Rochester Knee and Sports Medicine, PC
Represented By
Tamar Dolcourt
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, July 02, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 2:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rochester Knee and Sports Medicine, PC Related [+]. (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default,9 Motion for Default Judgment against Todd Allen Lancaster ,10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
10 10 order Default Judgment Mon 07/02 11:13 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Default Judgment Mon 07/02 10:35 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Todd Allen Lancaster Filed by Plaintiff Rochester Knee and Sports Medicine, PC (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 07/02 11:14 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:18-ap-4216 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/02 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-4216 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 06/19 2:10 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Todd Allen Lancaster - Default Judgment Motion due by 07/03/2018. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/25 2:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Todd Allen Lancaster 5/14/2018 (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Fri 05/25 9:44 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant - Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 06/01/2018. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 05/21 2:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on Todd Allen Lancaster 5/14/2018 (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 05/17 12:21 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Plaintiff Rochester Knee and Sports Medicine, PC. (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
3 3 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 05/15 9:39 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 5/22/2018. (kcm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rochester Knee and Sports Medicine, PC
Monday, May 14, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 05/14 2:09 PM
Summons Issued on Todd Allen Lancaster Answer Due 06/13/2018 (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/14 2:09 PM
Adversary case 18-04216 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Rochester Knee and Sports Medicine, PC against Todd Allen Lancaster. Fee Amount $350. (Dolcourt, Tamar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D