USA v. De Sousa
Maryland District Court | |
Case #: | 1:18-cr-00276 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday May 17, 2018 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Darryl De Sousa (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
1. | Baltimore's De Sousa released after hearing tax charges in federal court (baltimorebrew.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/22/2018 | |
2. | Former Baltimore police chief De Sousa's initial federal court appearance on tax charges set for Monday (baltimoresun.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/17/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 02/04/2019 11:53 AM EST |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 3 pgs SEALED INFORMATION as to Darryl De Sousa (1) count(s) 1-3. (cags, Deputy Clerk) | |
3 | 3 1 pgs -SEALED- MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Darryl De Sousa. (cags, Deputy Clerk) | |
4 | 4 1 pgs SEALED ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Darryl De Sousa (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 5/8/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk) |